AUTO CHEM LABORATORIES, INC. et al v. TURTLE WAX, INC.
Plaintiff: PROCRAFT INDUSTRIES, INC., BRUCE K. CULPEPPER and AUTO CHEM LABORATORIES, INC.
Defendant: TURTLE WAX, INC.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00156
Filed: April 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JUDGMENT in favor of TURTLE WAX, INC. against AUTO CHEM LABORATORIES, INC., PROCRAFT INDUSTRIES, INC., BRUCE K. CULPEPPER. Notice of Disposal attached. Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 1/31/2012. (mdf1)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ( DOC. 65 ); OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS THERETO (DOC. 67 ) AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 55 ); AND OVERRULING IN PART AND SUSTAINING, IN PART, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. 39 ). Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 9/24/10. (cib1)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 36 ), ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 45 ), WITH ONE EXCEPTION, AND OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS THERETO (DOC. 47 ). Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 9/21/09. (cib1)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. 36 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 5/27/2009. (sc1, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTO CHEM LABORATORIES, INC. et al v. TURTLE WAX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROCRAFT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Gregory H Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE K. CULPEPPER
Represented By: Gregory H Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTO CHEM LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Gregory H Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURTLE WAX, INC.
Represented By: Daniel A Tallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?