Smith v. Montgomery County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Billy M. Smith
Defendant: Montgomery County Sheriff's Office, Paul Henson, Steven D Gardiner, Doug Kowalski and Mike Hild
Case Number: 3:2010cv00448
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 DEFICIENCY ORDER re 170 Notice of Appeal filed by Billy M. Smith.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 8/16/2013. (kf)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING SMITHS OBJECTIONS (Doc. 158 ) TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING SMITHS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO APPEAL; OVERRULING SMITHS OBJECTIONS (Doc. 164 ) TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES SUPPLEMENTAL REP ORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING SMITHS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO APPEAL; OVERRULING SMITHS OBJECTIONS (Doc. 165 ) TO THEMAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING SMITHS MOTION TO STRIKE; DENYING SMITHS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO APPEAL (Doc. 147 ) AND DENYING SMITHS MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. 162 ). Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 8/1/2013. (kf)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. No. 162) the Defendants' Response (Doc. No. 160) to Plaintiff's Objections (Doc. No. 158) to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations on the issue remanded by the Sixth Circuit be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/24/2013. (kpf1)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RECOMMITTAL ORDER - This case is before the Court on Petitioner's Objections (Doc. No. 158 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations (Doc. No. 157 ). The District Judge has preliminarily considered the Objections and believes they will be more appropriately resolved after further analysis by the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly,pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(3), this matter is hereby returned to the Magistrate Judge with instructions to file a upplemental report analyzing the Objections and Response and makingrecommendations based on that analysis. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 6/6/2013. (kf)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 147 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Billy M. Smith. The Magistrate Judge confesses error in his prior conclusory finding of good cause. Mr. Smith has demonstrated neither good cause nor excusable neglect and his Motion for Extension of Time to Appeal should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/17/2013. (kf)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED: 1. That portion of the Decision and Deficiency Order of February 11, 2013, granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Appeal is VACATED; 2. The Clerk shall restore that Motion to the pending motions list i n the CM/ECF system; and 3. Defendants shall respond to the Motion for Extension of Time not later than April 22, 2013. (Plaintiff will then be permitted the standard time allowed under S. D. Ohio Civ. R. 7.2 17 days to file a reply in support.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 3/28/2013. (kpf1)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING SMITHS OBJECTIONS (Doc. 150 ) TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT ANDADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 145 ) REGARDING RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/28/2013. (kf)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 144 MOTION for Relief from Judgment re 143 Judgment filed by Billy M. Smith - Smith has not shown excusable neglect nor that he presented evidence in opposition to Defendants motions for summary judgment which created material issues for trial. He certainly has not shown Defendants would not be prejudiced by granting his Motion for Relief from Judgment. That Motion should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 01/30/13. (pb1)(Smith)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - re 138 - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Douglas Kowalski's Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 100 ), be granted; Defendants Montgomery County Sheriff's Office, Michael L. Hild, Jr.' ;s, Paul Hensons, and Steven Gardiner's Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 101 ), be granted; Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Henson, (Doc. 110 ), Kowalski, (Doc. 111 ), Montgomery County Sheriff's Office, (Doc. 112 ), Gardiner, (Doc. 121 ), and Hild, (Doc. 122 ), be denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing the Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 12/10/12. (kje1)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FOR SCREENING - Plaintiff's Motion for Screening by the Volunteer Lawyers' Project and a Stay of Proceedings until that screening is complete (Doc. No. 139) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 10/11/2012. (kpf1)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that (1) Defendant Douglas Kowalski's Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 100), be granted;(2) Defendants Montgomery County Sheriff's Office, Michael L. Hild, Jr.'s, Paul Henso n's, and Steven Gardiners Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 101), be granted; (3) [Plaintiff's] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Henson, (Doc. 110), be denied; (4) [Plaintiff's] Motion for Partial Summary Judgmen t against Defendant Kowalski, (Doc. 111), be denied; (5) [Plaintiff's] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendant Montgomery County Sheriff's Office, (Doc. 112), be denied; (6) [Plaintiff's] Motion for Partial Summary Judgme nt against Defendant Gardiner, (Doc. 121), be denied; and (7) [Plaintiff's] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendant Hild, (Doc. 122), be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 10/9/2012. (kpf1)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 DECISION AND ORDER denying 127 Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 9/13/12. (kje1)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECISION AND ORDER ON RECONSIDERATION - This case is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to the Court's Decision and Order (Doc. No. 119 ). Having reconsidered the prior Order in light of the Motion, the prior Order (Doc . No. 115 ) is VACATED and Plaintiff is granted leave to file partial summary judgment motions against Defendant Gardiner and Hild. The filing shall be accomplished by the Clerk's detaching the two motions from Doc. Nos. 113 and 114 , respectively, and filing the Motions. Those two Defendants shall have until August 6, 2012, to file responsive memoranda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 7/12/2012. (sc1)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 (AMENDED) ORDER TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF UPON FILING OF A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE 103 ) - You are hereby notified that Defendant Douglas Kowalski and Defendants Steven Gardiner, Paul Henson, Mike Hild and Montgomery County Sheriff's Office f iled with the Court on June 1, 2012, a motion for summary judgment in this case (Docs 101 and 102 ). You should receive a copy of each motion directly from Defendant Douglas Kowalski and Defendants Steven Gardiner, Paul Henson, Mike Hild and Montgom ery County Sheriff's Office. Under the rules of this Court (S.D. Ohio L.R. 7.2) you are allowed twenty-one days from the date of service (June 1, 2012) within which to file a response to each motion, plus an extra three days because of the way t he motions were sent to you. Your response toeach motion must be filed with the Court not later than June 25, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/4/2012. (PER CHAMBERS AMENDED TO CORRECT DOCUMENT NUMBERS ORDER IS TO BE LINKED TO). (kje1)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DECISION AND ORDER. Accordingly, each party's amended witness list is STRICKEN except as to Bill Couch, Jim Burke, Don Williams, and Christopher Ludwick who have been identified buy Plaintiff and at least one Defendant. To the extent any party seeks to add any other name to his witness list who was not identified by the due date of November 1, 2011, that party must seek leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/21/12. (kje1)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL - All additional discovery ordered shall be furnished to Plaintiff with a copy filed with the Court not later than March 30, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 3/14/2012. (kpf1)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting Leave to Propound Additional Interrogatories on 80 Motion ; granting 81 Motion ; granting 82 Motion ; granting 83 Motion ; granting 84 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 02/28/2012. (kf)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 76 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 2/1/12. (cib1)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL 70 and 71 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 12/20/2011. (mdf1)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 56 Report and Recommendations. - Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Montgomery County, Ohio are DISMISSED with prejudice as barred by the statute of limitations. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 08/23/11. (pb1)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - This case is before the Court on Motion of Defendants Detective Doug Kowalski, Montgomery County Sheriff's Office, Lieutenant Michael L. Hild, Jr., Detective Paul D. Henson, and Detective Steven Gardiner for Exemption from the Courts Ord er for Discovery Conference (Doc. No. 45). As the Defendants correctly point out, they are exempt from the initial disclosure requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) because Plaintiff is a person described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B)(iv). According ly, all parties are excused from participating in a discovery planning conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Instead, any party may submit to the Court in writing a proposed schedule for the events to be held in the case (e.g., deadlines for amendment of pleadings, discovery cut-off, summary judgment motions, and trial). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 7/25/2011. (kpf1)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DECISION AND ORDER - If Plaintiff can show some genuine conflict of interest as regards any particular attorney, the Court will consider removing him or her. But in the absence of such a showing, Plaintiff's Motion Opposing Representation of Def endants Montgomery County Sheriff's Office, Paul Henson, and Montgomery County, Ohio, by the Assistant County Prosecuting Attorneys John Cumming and Victoria Watson (Doc. No. 40) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 7/8/2011. (kpf1)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiff's time to make service of process on Defendants Steven Gardiner and Michael Hild is extended to and including July 10, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/23/2011. (kpf1)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ADDITION OF A PARTY DEFENDANT - This case is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended and Supplemented Complaint and to add Montgomery County, Ohio, as a defendant (Doc. No. 9). Be cause no answer has been filed in the case, Plaintiff does not need leave of court to amend. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the Clerk detach the proposed amended complaint from the Motion and file it separately. The request for joinder of Mon tgomery County is granted without prejudice to a determination, once the Montgomery County Board of County Commissioners has been served with process, of whether it is a proper defendant in this case in that the sued individual Defendants are employees of the Montgomery County Sheriff, an independently elected public official. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 3/23/2011. (kpf1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Montgomery County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?