Nichting v. DPL Inc, et al.
Plaintiff: Patrick Nichting
Defendant: Dolphin Sub, Inc., Paul M. Barbas, Pamela B. Morris, AES Corporation, Ned J. Sifferlen, Barbara S. Graham, Lester L. Lyles, Frank F. Gallaher, Robert D. Biggs, Glenn E. Harder and DPL Inc
Petitioner: Ralph B. Holtmann, Catherine P. Holtmann and Stephen Kubiak
Case Number: 3:2011cv00148
Filed: May 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2011 Notice of Correction re 15 Response to Motion: Clerk has removed pdf. This case has been consolidated and counsel advised that all filings were to be made in the lead case only. For future docketing, at the screen prompt: Do you want to spread this docket entry? CLICK NO (tt)
July 6, 2011 Filing 15 ***FORMER DN 15***RESPONSE to Motion re (41 in 3:11-cv-00141-TSB, 41 in 3:11-cv-00141-TSB) MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Discovery filed by Defendants Dolphin Sub, Inc., The AES Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Preliminary Proxy Statement, # 2 Exhibit Transcript) Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-00141-TSB, 3:11-cv-00148-TSB, 3:11-cv-00173-TSB (Holaday, Rodney) Modified on 7/7/2011 - To remove pdf and edit docket text language (tt).
June 13, 2011 Cases associated: Per #14 Order of Consolidation: Create association to 3:11-cv-00141-TSB. (mr1)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: Plaintiff's Motions to consolidate (Doc 10 - 3:11-cv-141; Doc 7 - 3:11-cv-148 and Doc 5 - 3:11-cv-173) are GRANTED; these three cases are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes under the LOWER DOCKET NUMBER 3:11-cv-141; ALL FUTURE FILINGS shall be made in Consolidated Case No. 3:11-cv-141. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/10/11. (mr1)
June 9, 2011 Notice of Correction re #12 Reply to Response to Motion: Docket text language has been modified to clarify identification of exhibits. (tt)
June 8, 2011 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Request an Early Hearing filed by Movant Stephen Kubiak. (Landskroner, Jack)
June 8, 2011 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Request an Early Hearing filed by Plaintiff Patrick Nichting. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John C. Cammillus, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G) (Camillus, John) Modified on 6/9/2011 - To clarify identification of exhibits (tt).
June 7, 2011 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Request an Early Hearing ; and Cross-Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Movants Catherine P. Holtmann, Ralph B. Holtmann. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Matthew R. Wilson, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Wilson, Matthew)
June 1, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Request an Early Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 10:45 AM in Teleconference before Judge Timothy S. Black. (lk)
June 1, 2011 Minute entry: This civil action came on before the Court for a telephone status conference on 6/1/11 at 1:30 p.m. Attorneys for Plaintiffs, Jack Landskroner, Stephen Otto, John Camillus, Juan Monteverde, Scott Shepherd, Matthew Wilson, and Darrin Williams, and Attorneys for Defendants, Charles Faruki, Thomas Kraemer, Amanda Kosowsky, William Porter, Edward Welch, Rodney Holaday, and Robert Saunders participated. All briefing on the issues of consolidation and lead and liaison counsel shall be completed by 6/8/11 at 5:00 p.m. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement with respect to these issues, the matter is set for a hearing and oral argument by telephone on 6/10/11 at 10:45 a.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (lk)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Juan E. Monteverde. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/1/11. (lk)
June 1, 2011 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Request an Early Hearing filed by Plaintiff Patrick Nichting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Camillus, John)
May 31, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Juan E. Monteverde (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-3178275) by Plaintiff Patrick Nichting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Camillus, John)
May 27, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: The telephone status conference set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 6/1/11 at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/1/11 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr)
May 26, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: This civil action is set for a telephone status conference on 6/1/11 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr)
May 25, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel, and Request an Early Hearing by Movant Stephen Kubiak. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jack Landskroner, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order) (Landskroner, Jack)
May 12, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Alan Holaday for Defendants AES Corporation, Dolphin Sub, Inc. (Holaday, Rodney)
May 12, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Dolphin Sub, Inc., The AES Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The AES Corporation for Dolphin Sub, Inc... (Porter, William)
May 12, 2011 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AES Corporation. (Porter, William)
May 12, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Glover Porter, II for Defendants AES Corporation, Dolphin Sub, Inc. (Porter, William)
May 5, 2011 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Juan E.Monteverde, Jayne A. Goldstein, Nathan Zipperian, Scott R. Shepherd, and Natalie Finkelman (jlw)
May 5, 2011 ...NOTICE, If case is to be referred, it will be Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz (pb1)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against DPL Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 paid - receipt number: 0648-3136876), filed by Patrick Nichting. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Camillus, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichting v. DPL Inc, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Rodney Alan Holaday
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Barbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela B. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Corporation
Represented By: Rodney Alan Holaday
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ned J. Sifferlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara S. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester L. Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank F. Gallaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn E. Harder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPL Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ralph B. Holtmann
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Catherine P. Holtmann
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Kubiak
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Nichting
Represented By: Juan E Monteverde
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?