Holtmann et al v. DPL, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Catherine P. Holtmann and Ralph B. Holtmann
Defendant: Dolphin Sub, Inc., Paul M. Barbas, General Lester L. Lyles, Pamela B. Morris, AES Corporation, DPL, Inc., Barbara S. Graham, Dr. Ned J. Sifferlen, Frank F. Gallaher, Paul R. Bishop, Robert D. Biggs and Glenn E. Harder
Petitioner: Patrick Nichting and Stephen Kubiak
Case Number: 3:2011cv00173
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2011 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re (41 in 3:11-cv-00141-TSB, 41 in 3:11-cv-00141-TSB) MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Discovery filed by Defendants Dolphin Sub, Inc., The AES Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Preliminary Proxy Statement, # 2 Exhibit Transcript) Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-00141-TSB, 3:11-cv-00148-TSB, 3:11-cv-00173-TSB (Holaday, Rodney)
June 13, 2011 Cases associated: Per #17 Order of Consolidation: Create association to 3:11-cv-00141-TSB. (mr1)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: Plaintiff's Motions to consolidate (Doc 10 - 3:11-cv-141; Doc 7 - 3:11-cv-148 and Doc 5 - 3:11-cv-173) are GRANTED; these three cases are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes under the LOWER DOCKET NUMBER 3:11-cv-141; ALL FUTURE FILINGS shall be made in Consolidated Case No. 3:11-cv-141. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/10/11. (mr1)
June 9, 2011 Notice of Correction re #15 Reply to Response to Motion: Docket text language has been modified to clarify identification of exhibits. (tt)
June 8, 2011 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Movant Stephen Kubiak. (Landskroner, Jack)
June 8, 2011 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Movant Patrick Nichting. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John C. Camillus, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G) (Camillus, John) Modified on 6/9/2011 - To clarify identification of exhibits (tt).
June 7, 2011 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Cross-Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Catherine P. Holtmann, Ralph B. Holtmann. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Matthew R. Wilson, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Wilson, Matthew)
June 3, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Alan Holaday for Defendants AES Corporation, Dolphin Sub, Inc. (Holaday, Rodney)
June 3, 2011 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Dolphin Sub, Inc., AES Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AES Corporation for Dolphin Sub, Inc... (Porter, William)
June 3, 2011 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AES Corporation. (Porter, William)
June 3, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Glover Porter, II for Defendants AES Corporation, Dolphin Sub, Inc. (Porter, William)
June 1, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 10:45 AM in Teleconference before Judge Timothy S. Black. (lk)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Darrin L. Williams. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/1/11. (mr)
June 1, 2011 Minute entry: This civil action came on before the Court for a telephone status conference on 6/1/11 at 1:30 p.m. Attorneys for Plaintiffs, Jack Landskroner, Stephen Otto, John Camillus, Juan Monteverde, Scott Shepherd, Matthew Wilson, and Darrin Williams, and Attorneys for Defendants, Charles Faruki, Thomas Kraemer, Amanda Kosowsky, William Porter, Edward Welch, Rodney Holaday, and Robert Saunders participated. All briefing on the issues of consolidation and lead and liaison counsel shall be completed by 6/8/11 at 5:00 p.m. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement with respect to these issues, the matter is set for a hearing and oral argument by telephone on 6/10/11 at 10:45 a.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (lk)
June 1, 2011 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Movant Patrick Nichting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Camillus, John)
May 31, 2011 PHV Filing fee: $200, receipt number 200COL017576 - RE: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Darrin L. Williams (jr1) Modified to edit text for detail on 6/1/2011 (mr).
May 27, 2011 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Darrin L. Williams (Filing fee $ 200) by Plaintiffs Catherine P. Holtmann, Ralph B. Holtmann. (Wilson, Matthew)
May 27, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Joseph Faruki for Defendants Paul M. Barbas, Robert D. Biggs, Paul R. Bishop, DPL, Inc., Frank F. Gallaher, Barbara S. Graham, Glenn E. Harder, Lester L. Lyles, Pamela B. Morris, Ned J. Sifferlen (Faruki, Charles)
May 27, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: The telephone status conference set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 6/1/11 at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/1/11 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr)
May 26, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: This civil action is set for a telephone status conference on 6/1/11 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr)
May 25, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Movant Stephen Kubiak. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jack Landskroner, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order) (Landskroner, Jack)
May 20, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Paul M. Barbas, Robert D. Biggs, Paul R. Bishop, DPL, Inc., Dolphin Sub, Inc., Frank F. Gallaher, Barbara S. Graham, Glenn E. Harder, Lester L. Lyles, Pamela B. Morris, Ned J. Sifferlen, AES Corporation. (kje1) Modified text to correct party names on 5/23/2011 (mr).
May 20, 2011 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against DPL, Inc., Paul M. Barbas, Barbara S. Graham, Glenn E. Harder, Paul R. Bishop, Robert D. Biggs, Dolphin Sub, Inc., Frank F. Gallaher, Lester L. Lyles, Pamela B. Morris, Ned J. Sifferlen, AES Corporation, filed by Ralph B. Holtmann and Catherine P. Holtmann. (kje1) Modified text to correct party names on 5/23/2011 (mr).
May 20, 2011 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney's Darrin L. Wiliams and Randall K. Pulliam. (kje1)
May 20, 2011 Filing 1 Filing fee: $350.00, receipt number 300DAY007058 (kje1)
May 20, 2011 If this case is referred it will be referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kje1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtmann et al v. DPL, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Rodney Alan Holaday
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Barbas
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Lester L. Lyles
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela B. Morris
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Corporation
Represented By: Rodney Alan Holaday
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPL, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara S. Graham
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ned J. Sifferlen
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank F. Gallaher
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Bishop
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Biggs
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn E. Harder
Represented By: Thomas Robert Kraemer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Nichting
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Kubiak
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine P. Holtmann
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Darrin L Williams
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph B. Holtmann
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Darrin L Williams
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?