Medical Center at Elizabeth Place LLC v. MedAmerica Health Systems Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Medical Center at Elizabeth Place, LLC
Defendant: MedAmerica Health Systems Corporation, Atrium Health System, Catholic Health Initiatives, Samaritan Health Partners, UVMC and Premier Health Partners
Case Number: 3:2012cv00026
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2017 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 192 Motion to File Document Under Seal (Joint Motion). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/19/17. (pb)
June 6, 2017 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY MEMORIALIZING MAY 12, 2017. CONFERENCE CALL - During a conference call held on May 12, 2017, the following topics were discussed: As previously scheduled, a Final Pretrial Conference will be held on August 4, 2017, at 1 :30 p.m., and Trial will commence on August 14, 2017. The Court will meet with counsel each day at 8:45 a.m. Trial will be held from 9:15 a.m.-4:30 p.m. Mondays through Thursdays, and 9:15 a.m.-12:15 p.m. on Fridays, with a one hour break for lunch. Eight jurors will b e seated, along with four-to-six alternates. The juryvenire will consist of at least 60-70 individuals who have been prescreenedfor scheduling conflicts. Each side shall be given three peremptory challenges for the panel of eight jurors, plus two mor e peremptory challenges for the alternate jurors. No later than July 17, 2017, counsel shall submit, for the Court's review, a jointly-prepared supplemental juror questionnaire, which will be mailed to all prospective jurors on July 31, 2017. N o later than August 7, 2017, counsel may also submit a list of questions that they would like the Court to ask during voir dire. As previously agreed, the deadline for challenging removal of confidential designations of deposition testimony and depo sition exhibits is June 28, 2017. Objections to trial exhibits are due by July 26, 2017. To the extent possible, the Court will make preliminary rulings on admissibility prior to trial. In order to preserve the August 14, 2017, trial date, counsel will bring any unresolved issues to the Court's attention as soon as possible. Counsel has requested daily trial transcripts, which the Court is able to provide. Counsel shall make arrangements with the Courtroom Deputy to test audiovisual equ ipment at least one week prior to trial. Prior to the trial testimony of each expert witness, counsel may present to the jury a 2-5 minute overview of what they anticipate that expert witness to say. Counsel will consider whether bifurcation of any of the issues for trial might be prudent. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/5/2017. (srb)
May 26, 2017 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 188 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/26/2017. (pb)
February 18, 2015 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF COSTS (Doc. 168 ); and (2) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DENY BILL OF COSTS (Doc. 169 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/18/15. (mr1)
March 31, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL. (Doc. 108 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/31/2014. (mr1)
March 12, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY EXPERT REPORTS AND EXPERT DISCOVERY (Doc. 110). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/12/2014. (mr1)
November 4, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) DENYING NON-PARTY RHI'S MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 72 ); (2) DENYING DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 83 ); AND (3) DENYING RHI'S MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. 88 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/4/2013. (mr1)
October 16, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL (Docs. 59 and 63 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/16/2013. (mr1)
July 25, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING RIVERVIEW HEALTH INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO QUASH (Doc. 49 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/25/2013. (mr1)
July 3, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/3/2013. (mr1)
May 24, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING PRODUCTION OF HARD COPY DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/24/2013. (mr1)
August 30, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 22 ) IS DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/30/12. (mr1)
June 22, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE JOINT OPERATING AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL (Doc. 21 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/22/12. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Center at Elizabeth Place LLC v. MedAmerica Health Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Center at Elizabeth Place, LLC
Represented By: James Alan Dyer
Represented By: Toby K Henderson
Represented By: Richard A Ripley
Represented By: James R Wade
Represented By: Nora L Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedAmerica Health Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samaritan Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UVMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?