June 15, 2020 |
Filing
318
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 6/15/2020. (kma)
|
May 21, 2020 |
Filing
316
ORDER OVERRULING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS RENEWED AND UPDATED MOTION FOR COSTS, EXPERT FEES, AND EXPENSES (DOC. # 291 ) AND DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. # 315 )- Having been advised that the parties have settled the matters of ex pert fees, costs and expenses, the Court OVERRULES AS MOOT Defendants Renewed and Updated Motion for Costs, Expert Fees, and Expenses (Doc. # 291 ), and Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File (1) Reply to Plaintiffs Memorandum Opposing Defendants Motion for Costs and Expert Fees and Expenses and (2) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Expert Fees. (Doc. # 315 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/20/2020. (kma)
|
May 1, 2020 |
Filing
314
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE (1) REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'SMEMORANDUM OPPOSING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR COSTS AND EXPERT FEES ANDEXPENSES AND (2) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPERT FEES- This matter is before th e Court on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File (1) Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum Opposing Defendants' Motion for Costs and Expert Fees and Expenses and (2) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Expert Fees. Doc. # 313 . De fendants' Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum Opposing Defendants' Motion for Costs and Expert Fees and Expenses and an Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Expert Fees on or before May 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/1/2020. (kma)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
267
DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY ISSUES FOR TRIAL (DOC. # 195 ), WHICH THE COURT CONSTRUES AS A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF JUDGE TIMOTHY BLACK'S OCTOBER 6, 2016, SEALED ORDER RESOLVING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. # 183 ); SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO PRECLUDE TRIAL OF UNPLE[D} "RIM CONSPIRACY" CLAIM (DOC. # 190 ); SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE TRIAL OF UNPLED "PHYSICIANS" CONSPIRA CY (DOC. # 194 ); OVERRULING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO PRECLUDE LAY WITNESS THOMAS MALLON FROM TESTIFYING ON DAMAGES (DOC. # 199 ), DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST FROM PLAINTIFF'S CALCULATION OF DAMAGES ( DOC. # 200 ), DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. HARRY E. FRECH III ON DAMAGES (DOC. # 205 ), DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S DAMAGES EXPERT HARRY E. FRECH, III, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WIT H FED. R. CIV. P. 26(e) AND 26(a)(2)(B) (DOC. # 201 ), DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY RELATING TO PREMIER'S CASH RESERVES (DOC. # 202 ), DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY ABOUT CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES (DOC. # 203 ), DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF JAMES L. WATSON (DOC. # 204 ), DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING HEARSAY FROM NON-TESTIFYING PHYSICIANS (DOC. # 206 ), DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE HEARSAY OF MANAGED CARE FACILITY REPRESENTATIVES (DOC. # 208 ), PLAINTIFF THE MEDICAL CENTER AT ELIZABETH PLACE'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS' PURPORTED JUSTIFICATIONS FOR THEIR ANTICOMPETITIV E CONDUCT (DOC. # 210 ), AND PLAINTIFF THE MEDICAL CENTER AT ELIZABETH PLACE'S SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK'S NON-COMPETE PROVISIONS (DOC. # 211 ); DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S SHERMAN ACT CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE; JUDGMENTTO ENTER IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF;TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/9/17. (kma) Modified on 8/9/2017 (kma).
|
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
263
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANTS' LIST OF CAUSE OBJECTIONS TO AUGUST 4, 2017 LIST OF POTENTIAL JURORS granting 257 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/8/2017. (pb)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
196
ORDER granting 192 Motion to File Document Under Seal (Joint Motion). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/19/17. (pb)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing
191
ENTRY MEMORIALIZING MAY 12, 2017. CONFERENCE CALL - During a conference call held on May 12, 2017, the following topics were discussed: As previously scheduled, a Final Pretrial Conference will be held on August 4, 2017, at 1 :30 p.m., and Trial will commence on August 14, 2017. The Court will meet with counsel each day at 8:45 a.m. Trial will be held from 9:15 a.m.-4:30 p.m. Mondays through Thursdays, and 9:15 a.m.-12:15 p.m. on Fridays, with a one hour break for lunch. Eight jurors will b e seated, along with four-to-six alternates. The juryvenire will consist of at least 60-70 individuals who have been prescreenedfor scheduling conflicts. Each side shall be given three peremptory challenges for the panel of eight jurors, plus two mor e peremptory challenges for the alternate jurors. No later than July 17, 2017, counsel shall submit, for the Court's review, a jointly-prepared supplemental juror questionnaire, which will be mailed to all prospective jurors on July 31, 2017. N o later than August 7, 2017, counsel may also submit a list of questions that they would like the Court to ask during voir dire. As previously agreed, the deadline for challenging removal of confidential designations of deposition testimony and depo sition exhibits is June 28, 2017. Objections to trial exhibits are due by July 26, 2017. To the extent possible, the Court will make preliminary rulings on admissibility prior to trial. In order to preserve the August 14, 2017, trial date, counsel will bring any unresolved issues to the Court's attention as soon as possible. Counsel has requested daily trial transcripts, which the Court is able to provide. Counsel shall make arrangements with the Courtroom Deputy to test audiovisual equ ipment at least one week prior to trial. Prior to the trial testimony of each expert witness, counsel may present to the jury a 2-5 minute overview of what they anticipate that expert witness to say. Counsel will consider whether bifurcation of any of the issues for trial might be prudent. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/5/2017. (srb)
|
May 26, 2017 |
Filing
189
ORDER granting 188 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/26/2017. (pb)
|
February 18, 2015 |
Filing
172
ORDER: (1) DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF COSTS (Doc. 168 ); and (2) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DENY BILL OF COSTS (Doc. 169 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/18/15. (mr1)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
119
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL. (Doc. 108 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/31/2014. (mr1)
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
117
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY EXPERT REPORTS AND EXPERT DISCOVERY (Doc. 110). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/12/2014. (mr1)
|
November 4, 2013 |
Filing
94
ORDER: (1) DENYING NON-PARTY RHI'S MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 72 ); (2) DENYING DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 83 ); AND (3) DENYING RHI'S MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. 88 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/4/2013. (mr1)
|
October 16, 2013 |
Filing
85
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL (Docs. 59 and 63 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/16/2013. (mr1)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER DENYING RIVERVIEW HEALTH INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO QUASH (Doc. 49 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/25/2013. (mr1)
|
July 3, 2013 |
Filing
55
STIPULATED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/3/2013. (mr1)
|
May 24, 2013 |
Filing
48
STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING PRODUCTION OF HARD COPY DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/24/2013. (mr1)
|
August 30, 2012 |
Filing
37
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 22 ) IS DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/30/12. (mr1)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
26
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE JOINT OPERATING AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL (Doc. 21 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/22/12. (mr1)
|