Myers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Myers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2012cv00192
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECISION AND ENTRY - It is therefore ORDERED that: 1. The Report and Recommendations docketed on January 6, 2017 (Doc. # 22 )is ADOPTED in full; 2. Counsel's Motion For Allowance Of Attorney Fees (Doc. # 18 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs couns el is awarded $27,000.00 in attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b); 3. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to remit $8,900.00 to Plaintiff, which is the total amount of attorney fees counsel has received under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d); and 4. The case remains terminated on the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/8/2017. (srb)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 1) 18 MOTION for Allowance of Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff's counsel be granted; 2) Plaintiff's counsel be directed to remit to Plaintiff $8,900.00, which is the total amount of attorney fees counsel has received under the Equal Access to Justice Act; and 3) The case remain terminated on the Court's docket. Objections to R&R due by 1/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/6/17. (mcm)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT with Attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 09/27/13. (pb1)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by John Myers - IT THEREFORE IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. The Commissioner's final non-disability decision be reversed; 2. Plaintiff John Myers case be REMANDED to the Social Security Administration for payment of benefits consistent with the Social Security Act; and 3. The case be terminated on the docket of this Court Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 07/16/13. (pb1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Myers
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?