Saba v. U.S. Army Intelligence and Security Command, Ft Meade et al
Plaintiff: Nidal Saba
Defendant: U.S. Army Intelligence and Security Command, Ft Meade, U.S. Army Claims Service Office of Judge Advocate General, Ft Meade, Attorney General of the United States and Assistant U.S. Attorney, Columbus, Ohio
Case Number: 3:2012cv00305
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:4208
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED JUDGMENT BY CLERK 21 . (tt) Modified on 1/10/2014 to include hyper-link and reflect the filing will be sent via regular mail to plaintiff, along with Order, at the address listed on 1/13/2014 (tt).
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT, with Attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 01/02/2014. (pb1)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF UPON FILING OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/30/13. (kje1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saba v. U.S. Army Intelligence and Security Command, Ft Meade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nidal Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Intelligence and Security Command, Ft Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Claims Service Office of Judge Advocate General, Ft Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant U.S. Attorney, Columbus, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?