PNC Bank, National Association, Successor by Merger to National City Bank v. Gator Piqua Partners LLLP et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association, Successor by Merger to National City Bank
Defendant: Gator Piqua Partners LLLP and James A Goldsmith
Special_master: Anne Frayne
Case Number: 3:2012cv00369
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/4/2016. (ead)
January 20, 2016 163 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT JAMES A GOLDSMITH TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF RECORDS (DOC. # 150 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 1/20/2016. (jdf)
October 8, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING DEFENDANT JAMES GOLDSMITH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR RECOVERY OF ITS EXPENSES, INCLUDING ATTORNEYS' FEE S AND COSTS (DOC.# 145 ); SETTING CONFERENCE CALL TO DISCUSS OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY ISSUES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS ; The Court will hold a conference call on October 15, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. (EST), to discuss these outstanding discovery issues, and to set a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, Doc. # 146 . Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/8/15. (pb)
March 11, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT JAMES GOLDSMITH (DOC. # 38 ), WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL AT CONCLUSION OF ANY NECESSARY DISCOVERY; SUGGESTED MEDIATION DATES; DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE, LEADING TO THE FILING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON AN AS-NEEDED BASIS; DATE TO REFILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON AN AS-NEEDEDBASIS. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 3/11/2014. (gh1)
February 28, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY RE: APPLICATION OF SALE PROCEEDS TO THE AMOUNT OWED BY DEFENDANT JAMES GOLDSMITH UNDER THE TERMS OF THE PERSONAL GUARANTY; OVERRULING AS MOOT DEFENDANT GATOR PIQUA PARTNERS, LLLP'S MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENCE 104 ; CONFERENCE C ALL SET. The Court, having determined that the sale proceeds cannot be credited toward Goldsmith's obligations under the Guaranty, directs the parties to resume settlement negotiations as soon as possible to determine if this one remaining clai m can now be resolved. CONFERENCE CALL SET FOR 3/10/2014 @ 4:00 p.m. to determine the status of settlement negotiations and, if those efforts have proven unsuccessful, to set a schedule for additional discovery and further briefing on the pending motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 2/28/2014. (gh1)
February 6, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND ENTRY ON PARTIAL SETTLEMENT re 96 . Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 1/6/2014. (jdf1)
December 5, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BAR DEFENDANT JAMES GOLDSMITH FROM PURCHASING PIQUA PLAZA BELOW REDEMPTION VALUE (DOC. # 66 ); SUSTAINING RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING AND CONFIRMING SALE OF THE REAL PROPERTY KNO WN AS PIQUA PLAZA LOCATED AT 1923-1947 COVINGTON AVENUE, PIQUA, MIAMI COUNTY, OHIO, ESTABLISHING THE TERMS OF SALE, APPOINTING APPRAISERS, APPROVING APPRAISALS, AND OTHERWISE ESTABLISHING THE PROCEDURES FOR CONDUCTING THE SALE (DOC. # 73 ); SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF RIGHT TO CREDIT BID (DOC. # 65 ); SETTING CONFIRMATION HEARING FOR DECEMBER 20, 2013 AT 9:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 12/5/13. (pb1)
October 25, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Reference - Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1)(A), (B), and (C), and §636(b)(3), the above-captioned action is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington, ADR Coordinator. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 10/25/13. (pb1)
August 28, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 08/28/13. (pb1)
August 5, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 18 ). Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 8/5/2013. (kf)
November 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE in favor of PNC Bank, National Association, Successor by Merger to National City Bank against Gator Piqua Partners LLLP. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 11/13/2012. (sc1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association, Successor by Merger to National City Bank v. Gator Piqua Partners LLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association, Successor by Merger to National City Bank
Represented By: John Michael Debbeler
Represented By: Jeffrey M Hendricks
Represented By: Scott K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gator Piqua Partners LLLP
Represented By: Valerie Marie Munafo
Represented By: Victoria L Nilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Goldsmith
Represented By: Victoria L Nilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Anne Frayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?