Barber v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ronnie Barber
Case Number: 3:2013cv00110
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Accordingly, the Commissioners motion 14 is now STAYED. This case shall proceed as follows: 1.) The Commissioners Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Statement of Errors (doc. 10) shall be filed on or before March 3, 2014; and 2.) Plaintiffs Reply, if any, shall be filed by March 14, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 02/04/14. (pb1)
September 22, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT: (1) THE ALJ'S NON-DISABILITY FINDING IS NOT SUPPORTED BY SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENCE, AND IS REVERSED; (2) THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE ALJ UNDER THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); AND (3) THIS CASE IS CLOSED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/22/2014. (mr1)
June 18, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MANAGEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 06/18/13. (pb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Barber
Represented By: Steven Barry Horenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.