Du v. Lebanon Correctional Institution

Respondent: Lebanon Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Chi Q. Du
Case Number: 3:2013cv00121
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: WARREN
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 3 ) AND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 6 ); OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS TO THOSE JUDICIAL FILINGS (DOCS. ## 4 and 7 ) ; DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (DOC. # 1 ) WITH PREJUDICE; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY AND ANTICIPATED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS; JUDGMENT TO ENTER IN FAVOR OF RESPONDENT AND AGAINST PETITIONER; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 08/23/13. (pb1)
June 17, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Having reconsidered the matter in light of the Objections, the Magistrate Judge again respectfully recommends that the Petition be dismissed with prejudice, that the Petitioner be denied a certificate of appealability, and that the Court certify an appeal would not be taken in objective good faith. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/17/2013. (kpf1)
May 30, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMITTAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 05/30/13. (pb1)
April 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Chi Q. Du - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition hereinbe dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion. Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify that any appeal would not be taken in objective good faith. Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 04/22/13. (pb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Du v. Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chi Q. Du
Represented By: Jay Allen Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?