Fulkerson v. Yaskawa America Inc.

Plaintiff: Stephanie Fulkerson
Defendant: Yaskawa America Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00130
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANT YASKAWA AMERICA, INC.'S UNOPPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (DOC. #1 09); AWARDING DEFENDANT AN ADDITIONAL $3,150.00 IN ATTORNEY FEES; SETTING CONFERENCE CALL FOR APRIL 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/21/16. (pb)
March 7, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS (DOC. # 104 ); AWARDING PLAINTIFF $8,795.00 IN SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEY FEES, AND $2,813.59 IN COSTS; SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFE NDANT YASKAWA AMERICA, INC'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS (DOC. # 105 ); AWARDING DEFENDANT$ 37,507.50 IN ATTORNEY FEES AND $1,579.25 IN COSTS; DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR FEES WITHIN 7 CALENDAR DAYS; PLAINTIFF MAY FILE RESPONSE WITHIN 7 CALENDAR DAYS THEREAFTER. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 03/7/16. (pb)
October 23, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY AWARDING PLAINTIFF LIQUIDATED DAMAGES UNDER 29 U.S.C. § 216(b); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (DOC. # 97 ); AWARDING PLAINTIFF $39,776.43 IN ATTORNEY'S FEES TO DA TE; PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL FEE MOTION AND ADDITIONAL MATERIALS TO SUPPORT MOTION FOR COSTS WITHIN 10 DAYS; DEFENDANT MAY FILE RESPONSE WITHIN 7 DAYS THEREAFTER; DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTATION OF FEES AND COSTS RELATED TO TRIAL DELAY WITHIN 10 DAYS; PLAINTIFF MAY FILE RESPONSE WITHIN 7 DAYS THEREAFTER. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/23/15. (pb)
May 8, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S RULING ON FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT RETALIATION CLAIM. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 5/7/2015. (jdf)
October 14, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND EXHIBIT LIST (DOC. # 41 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART PLAINTIFFS SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND EXHIBIT LIST (DOC. # 42 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND LITIGATION STRESS (DOC. # 43 ); VACATING OCTOBER 8, 2014, NOTATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 10/14/2014. (jdf1)
September 16, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT YASKAWA AMERICA, INC. (DOC. # 23 ). Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 9/16/2014. (jdf1)
August 12, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (DOC. # 35 ); NEW TRIAL DATE AND OTHER DATES SET, ( Jury Trial set for 10/14/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H Rice.Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 5:00 PM by Teleconference before Judge Walter H Rice.,Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2014., Motions due by 9/17/2014., Exhibit List due by 9/19/2014). Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 08/12/14. (pb1)
March 12, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The discovery phase of this case has ended. No discovery motion or other matter referred to the undersigned Judicial Officer remains pending. The case is presently set for further proceedings, including trial, before United States District Ju dge Walter H. Rice. The Clerk of Courts, therefore, is directed to note in the record that: 1. Referral of this case to the undersigned Judicial Officer has expired; and 2. No motion or other matter in this case remains pending before the undersigned Judicial Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 3/12/2014. (gh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulkerson v. Yaskawa America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fulkerson
Represented By: John Randolph Folkerth, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Heisele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaskawa America Inc.
Represented By: Rosemary Doreen Canton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?