Midmark Corporation v. Janak Healthcare Private Limited et al
Plaintiff: |
Midmark Corporation |
Defendant: |
Janak Healthcare Private Limited, Apurva Jayantilal Mehta, Hema A Mehta, Atman A Mehta, Subir A Mehta, Hasmukh Jivraj Mehta, Amit H Mehta, Vasant H Mehta and Raj H Mehta |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00088 |
Filed: |
March 18, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Dayton Office |
County: |
MONTGOMERY |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas M Rose |
Nature of Suit: |
Arbitration |
Cause of Action: |
09 U.S.C. § 1 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
55
FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING RELIEF TO PETITIONER MIDMARK CORPORATION AND ISSUING PERMANENT INJUNCTION - ITS IS ORDERED THAT all Respondents named in Midmark's Petition are hereby ENJOINED from taking any action in furtherance of the Indian Petition; the Mehta Family Respondents must dismiss, withdraw, or cause to be dismissed or withdrawn, the Indian Petition within three (3) business days of service of this Order which service shall be accomplished by Midmark through the channels alr eady approved by the Court to reasonably reach the Mehta Family Respondents; if the Indian Petition is not dismissed within the time specified by this Court, then the Mehta Family Respondents must show cause within seven (7) days of the expiration of the time period described in Part B, above, as to why they have not complied with this Order; and this final judgment that the claims asserted by Midmark in the Verified Petition are subject to arbitration should be considered conclusive and enforceable. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 6/16/14. (ep)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
48
ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on May 20, 2014. (jab)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
39
ENTRY and ORDER denying Motion for Service via Alternative Means. Doc. 28. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on May 1, 2014. (jab)
|
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
27
ENTRY and ORDER denying Motion to Dismiss, doc. 16, and ENJOINING Defendants from pursuing their action before the Company Law Board until this Court rules on Plaintiffs motion to compel arbitration, which this Court will do immediately upon notice that Defendants have been served under the Hague Convention or have waived service of process. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on April 16, 2014. (jab)
|
March 28, 2014 |
Filing
14
ENTRY AND ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOC. 9). A hearing on personal jurisdiction will be held on April 14, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Respondent's brief on personal jurisdiction is due April 4, 2014, Petitioner's Response April 9, 2014, and Respondents' Reply (if any, April 11, 2014. This Order expires 3:00 p.m. U.S. Eastern Time, April 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on March 28, 2014, 3:16 P.M. (jab).
|
March 19, 2014 |
Filing
9
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - AMENDED TO INCLUDE SIGNATURE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on March 19, 2014. (jab)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?