Parillo et al v. New Werner Co. et a.
Plaintiff: Dave J Parillo and Teresa K Parillo
Defendant: New Werner Co, New Werner Holding Co (DE), LLC, Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00369
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JERNER AND DR. BURKE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-19-2017. (de)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE 87 TO RESPOND INSTANTER TO DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF AND GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE 83 TO EXCLUDE LAY WITNESS OPINION TESTIMONY REGARDING MEDICAL CAUSATION AND DIAGNOSIS. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-18-2017. (de)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment as moot and granting 63 Joint Motion to Drop Parties. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1-19-2017. (de)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 47 Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Subject Ladder. Signed by Magistrate Chief Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 2/24/16. (mcm) Modified on 2/24/2016 (mcm).
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS 33 AND DISMISSING COUNTS 1, 2, 6, AND 7 OF THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT 31 . Accordingly, Counts 1, 2, 6 and 7 of the Third Amended Complaint 31 are dismissed. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-28-2015. (de)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING THE PARILLOS' MOTION TO REMAND (Doc. 9 ). There is no evidence that Defendants failed to attach all copies of all process, pleadings and orders served upon Defendants as required by the removal statute. If there was a procedural failure, and the Court has not identified one, Defendants could correct it. Plaintiff's argument regarding unanimity of consent cannot be considered, but, if it were, it is without merit because there is unanimity of consent and Defendants were not required to allege unanimity of consent in its removal Notice. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 12/4/14. (ep)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT NEW WERNER HOLDING CO (DE) LLC TO INFORM THE COURT NOT LATER THAN NOVEMBER 12, 2014, OF THE NAME AND CITIZENSHIP OF EACH MEMBER. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 11/4/14. (ep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parillo et al v. New Werner Co. et a.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave J Parillo
Represented By: A. Robert Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa K Parillo
Represented By: A. Robert Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Werner Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Werner Holding Co (DE), LLC
Represented By: Dale E Markworth
Represented By: Michael P Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Dale E Markworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?