Smith v. City of Troy Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Victor L. Smith
Defendant: City of Troy Ohio, Miami County, Ohio, P M Osting, S A Gates, H Hohenstein, C A Madigan and John Doe 1-9
Case Number: 3:2015cv00054
Filed: February 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: TERMINATION ENTRY - The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within 30 days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4/3/19. (ep)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' FOURTH JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE. ECF 86 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4/1/19. (ep)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BY DEFENDANTS, DEPUTY PHILLIP OSTING AND OFFICER SCOTT GATES. ECF 68 : Wherefore Joint Motion for Sanctions by Defendants, Deputy Phillip Osting and Officer Scott Gates, ECF 68 , is GRANTED. Defendants are GRANTED until March 22, 2019 to file a bill of costs with a proposed judgment entry. Plaintiff is GRANTED until April 1, 2019 to object to Defendants' cost calculation. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 3/4/19. (ep)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, CITY OF TROY, OHIO, PATROLMAN S.A. GATES, PATROLMAN H. HOHENSTEIN, AND PATROLMAN C.A. MADIGAN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. DOC. 48 , AND DEFENDANTS MIAMI COUNTY AND DEPUTY PHILLIP OSTING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. DOC. 51 . SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS AWARDED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS ARISING UNDER FEDERAL LAW. PLAINTIFF'S REMAINING CLAIMS ARE STATE-LAW CLAIMS WHICH ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAID'S CR OSS-CLAIM, DOC. 34 , IS LIKEWISE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE : The Clerk is ORDERED to DISMISS the instant action. Plaintiff's state law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Ohio Department of Medicaids Cross-Claim, Doc. 34, is likewise DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The CLERK is ORDERED to TERMINATE the instant action from the docket records of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, Western Division, at Dayton. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/14/2016. (ep)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE (Doc. 37 ). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 4/12/2016. (cvf)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: 1) granting 27 Troy Defendants' Motion for Joinder; 2) The Troy Defendants' Alternative Request is DENIED without prejudice to renewal; and 3) On or before January 8, 2015, Plaintiff shall effect service of summons, the Complaint, and a copy of this Order upon the Ohio Department of Medicaid. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 12-9-15. (mcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Troy Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor L. Smith
Represented By: Scott Sander Davies
Represented By: Michael J. Leddy
Represented By: Bryan K Penick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Troy Ohio
Represented By: Edward Joseph Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami County, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P M Osting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S A Gates
Represented By: Edward Joseph Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Hohenstein
Represented By: Edward Joseph Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C A Madigan
Represented By: Edward Joseph Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?