The Hartley Company v. JF Acquisition, LLC d/b/a Jones & Frank

Plaintiff: The Hartley Company
Defendant: JF Acquisition, LLC d/b/a Jones & Frank
Case Number: 3:2015cv00094
Filed: March 12, 2015
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE TO THE MIAMI COUNTY, OHIO, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS; MOTIONS IN LIMINE OF PLAINTIFF THE HARTLEY COMPANY AND DEFENDANT JF ACQUISITION, LLC, d/b/a JONES & FRANK (DOC. # 22 , 23 , 24 , 25 , 26 , 27 ) AND JF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY (DOC. # 57 ) ARE OVERRULED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, SUBJECT TO REFILING UPON REMAND; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/2/2017. (srb)
May 1, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY FINDING THAT THE OHIO PETROLEUM UNDERGROUND STORAGE TANK RELEASE COMPENSATION BOARD IS A NECESSARY PARTY UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 19, BUT THAT THE ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION PROHIBITS JOINDER OF THE BOARD BY THIS COURT; FINDING THE BOARD IS AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY, AS THIS CASE MAY NOT, IN EQUITY AND GOOD CONSCIENCE, PROCEED ABSENT THE BOARD'S PARTICIPATION; CAPTIONED CAUSE SHALL REMAIN ACTIVE ON THE COURT'S DOCKET FOR THIRTY (30 ) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ENTRY TO ALLOW PARTIES TO FILE MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION; IF NO SUCH MOTION IS FILED, COURT WILL ISSUE ORDER REMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE TO THE MIAMI COUNTY, OHIO, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/1/2017. (srb)
January 9, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ORDERING ORAL ARGUMENT AND EVIDENTIARY HEARING BETWEEN PLAINTIFF THE HARTLEY COMPANY AND DEFENDANT JF ACQUISITION, LLC d/b/a JONES & FRANK REGARDING WHETHER THE STATE OF OHIO PETROLEUM UNDERGROUND STORAGE TANK RELEASE COMPENSATION BOARD IS A NECESSARY PARTY AND MUST BE JOINED AS A PLAINTIFF; ARGUMENT AND HEARING SHALL BE CONDUCTED VIA TELEPHONE AND AT A TIME AND DATE TO BE DETERMINED DURING JANUARY 9, 2017, FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 1/9/2017. (jdf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hartley Company v. JF Acquisition, LLC d/b/a Jones & Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hartley Company
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Susan Jahangiri
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JF Acquisition, LLC d/b/a Jones & Frank
Represented By: Katherine Lynn Kennedy
Represented By: Ryan K Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?