Foley et al v. University of Dayton Office of Legal Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Andrew W. Foley, Evan Foley and Michael Fagans
Defendant: University of Dayton Office of Legal Affairs, Bruce Burt, Thomas Burkhardt, Harry Sweigart, Thomas Ryan, Kevin Bernhardt, Robert Babal, Eric Roth, Jonathan McCoy, Michael Sipes, Bradley Swank, Joseph Cairo, Michael R. Groff and Dylan Parfitt
Case Number: 3:2015cv00096
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Leave to Manually File Video Compact Discs- This matter comes before the Court on Defendants Motion for Leave to Manually FileVideo Compact Discs (""CD s"). For the reasons stated in the Motion, and for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby ORDERED to permit Defendants to manually file video CDs.. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 7/23/18. (kma)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECISION AND ENTRY - ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 73 Report and Recommendations, Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 69 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 7/24/17. (pb)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 69 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Dismiss be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 7-6-17. (mcm)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANT DYLAN PARFITT'S UNOPPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND MOTION TO LIFT STAY (DOC. # 49 ) AND UNOPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANT, MICHAEL GROFF, FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. # 50 ) - On November 3, 2016, the Supreme Court of Ohio held that no cause of action exists in Ohio for negligent misidentification. Foley v. University of Dayton, --N.E.3d--, 2016-0hio-7591, 2016 WL 6519115. Given that this was the only claim asserted agai nst Defendants Dylan Parfitt and Michael Groff, the Court SUSTAINS Defendant Dylan Parfitt's Supplemental Motion for Judgment on thePleadings (Doc. # 49 ), and Motion of Defendant Michael Groff, for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. # 50 ). Both motions are unopposed.Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 12/6/16. (kma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley et al v. University of Dayton Office of Legal Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew W. Foley
Represented By: Michael Anthony Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Foley
Represented By: Michael Anthony Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fagans
Represented By: Michael Anthony Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Dayton Office of Legal Affairs
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Burt
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Burkhardt
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Sweigart
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ryan
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bernhardt
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Babal
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Roth
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan McCoy
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sipes
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Swank
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cairo
Represented By: Todd M Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Groff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?