United States of America v. Race Horse Named Shanon Nicole Net Sale Proceeds in the amount of 195772.50 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Race Horse Named Shanon Nicole Net Sale Proceeds in the amount of 195772.50, Race Horse Named Baryshnikov Net Sale Proceeds in the amount of 3900.50, Zia Park Racetrack Net Racing Proceeds in the amount of 27548.00, Sam Houston Racepark Net Racing Proceeds in the amount of 40546.00, Account 2934 US Bank in the name of Silver Bridle Racing LLC in the amount of 108902.18, Account 3007 US Bank in the name of Silver Bridle Racing LLC in the amount of 22158.63, Account 4687 US Bank in the name of Connie Apostelos in the amount of 1599.75, Account 9796 Key Bank in the name of WMA Enterprises LLC in the amount of 125509.60, Account 9960 Key Bank in the name of Coleman Capital Inc in the amount of 8012.75, Account 9978 Key Bank in the name of Coleman Capital Inc in the amount of 13940.72, Account 1028 Key Bank in the name of Connie Apostelos in the amount of 2376.34, Account 9788 Key Bank in the name of Midwest Green Resources LLC in the amount of 616.83, Account 8300 JP Morgan Chase in the name of William or Connie Apostelos in the amount of 2568.42, Account 1858 JP Morgan Chase in the name of Apostelos Enterprises Inc in the amount of 1964.76, 10007.00 in U.S. Currency, 1000.00 in U.S. Currency, 2005 Seadoo Challenger Boat with Trailer SN JS CFC30985E505, 2008 BMW M3 VIN WBSWL93548PL89282, 2008 Kawasaki Teryx KRF 750 Gator ATV VIN Obliterated, 2008 Sun Lite Rattler Camper Model 7H T21 VIN 1S4BU212783016096, 2009 4 Star Gooseneck Horse Trailer VIN 4FKPG192190030562, Miscellaneous Artwork Scluptures Including Life Size Bronze Statue of Baryshnikov and Miscellaneous Jewelry
Case Number: 3:2015cv00143
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6/20/2019. (srb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AGREED ORDER WITHDRAWING CLAIMS OF WILLIAM APOSTELOS, WMA ENTERPRISES, LLC, MIDWEST GREEN RESOURCES, LLC, APOSTELOS ENTERPRISES, INC., CONNIE APOSTELOS, COLEMAN CAPITAL, INC. and SILVER BRIDLE, LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5-22-2019. (de)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER LIFTING STAY - This matter is before the Court upon the United States Motion to Lift Stay, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The United States Motion to Lift Stay is granted. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5/21/2019. (srb)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The United States shall file quarterly Status Reports beginning December 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/3/15. (ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Race Horse Named Shanon Nicole Net Sale Proceeds in the amount of 195772.50 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Pamela M Stanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Race Horse Named Shanon Nicole Net Sale Proceeds in the amount of 195772.50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Race Horse Named Baryshnikov Net Sale Proceeds in the amount of 3900.50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zia Park Racetrack Net Racing Proceeds in the amount of 27548.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Houston Racepark Net Racing Proceeds in the amount of 40546.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 2934 US Bank in the name of Silver Bridle Racing LLC in the amount of 108902.18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 3007 US Bank in the name of Silver Bridle Racing LLC in the amount of 22158.63
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 4687 US Bank in the name of Connie Apostelos in the amount of 1599.75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 9796 Key Bank in the name of WMA Enterprises LLC in the amount of 125509.60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 9960 Key Bank in the name of Coleman Capital Inc in the amount of 8012.75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 9978 Key Bank in the name of Coleman Capital Inc in the amount of 13940.72
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 1028 Key Bank in the name of Connie Apostelos in the amount of 2376.34
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 9788 Key Bank in the name of Midwest Green Resources LLC in the amount of 616.83
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 8300 JP Morgan Chase in the name of William or Connie Apostelos in the amount of 2568.42
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account 1858 JP Morgan Chase in the name of Apostelos Enterprises Inc in the amount of 1964.76
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10007.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2005 Seadoo Challenger Boat with Trailer SN JS CFC30985E505
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 BMW M3 VIN WBSWL93548PL89282
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Kawasaki Teryx KRF 750 Gator ATV VIN Obliterated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Sun Lite Rattler Camper Model 7H T21 VIN 1S4BU212783016096
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2009 4 Star Gooseneck Horse Trailer VIN 4FKPG192190030562
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Artwork Scluptures Including Life Size Bronze Statue of Baryshnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?