Wengerd v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Wengerd and Sarah Walker
Defendant: Self-Reliance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00293
Filed: August 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Stay. Defendants Motion to Stay is hereby GRANTED. The Parties shall submit a Motion to Approve the Settlement within ninety (90) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-3-2017. (de)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FOR COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE (Doc. 14 ): Plaintiffs' counsel is permitted to send within 20 days of the Order granting this Motion, the Court-authori zed Notice and Consent Form via U.S. Mail and electronic mail to putative class members. Notice should also be posted at Self-Reliance facilities. Plaintiffs also request a 60-day opt-in period for the putative class. Additionally, Plaintiffs counsel is authorized to send a second, identical copy of the Notice and Consent Form to members of the putative class 30 days into the opt-in period, reminding them of the deadline for the submission of the Consent Forms. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2/6/17. (ep)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 33 , Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleading 16 is DENIED; and the Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Complaint [31-1]. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-24-2016. (de)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleading 16 be DENIED; and the Clerk of Court be directed to file Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 10/20/2016. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10/3/2016. (lek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wengerd v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Wengerd
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Self-Reliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?