February 19, 2019 |
Filing
149
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants Dennis F. Quebe and Linda G. Quebe are jointly and severally liable to Plaintiff the United States of America in the amount of $302,696.70 as of February 15, 2019, plus interest running until paid and computed at the underpayment rate established under Sections 6621 and 6622 of Title 26 and Section 1961(c)(1) of Title 28 of the United States Code. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2/19/19. (ep)
|
January 25, 2019 |
Filing
147
ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM FOR TAX DEDUCTIONS UNDER SECTION 179D OF THE INTERNAL REVENUE CODE (DOC. 78 ); DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING § 179D DEDUCTION (DOC. 80 ); DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF R. NICHOLSON WORLEY (DOC. 130 ) AS MOOT; ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT ENTRY WITHIN 21 DAYS; AND TERMINATING CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1/25/19. (ep)
|
January 17, 2019 |
Filing
146
ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM FOR TAX CREDITS UNDER SECTION 41 OF THE INTERNAL REVENUE CODE 76 ; DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT R&D TAX CREDIT 91 ; AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF YVAN J. BELIVEAU 83 AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose (dje).
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
145
ENTRY AND ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT TO CHAMBERS BINDERS CONTAINING HARD COPIES OF MEMORANDA AND EXHIBITS FOR ALL PENDING MOTIONS : The deadlinefor submission of the binders to Chambers is January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1/11/18. (ep)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing
137
ORDER GRANTING SECOND ENTENSION OF BRIEFING DEADLINE 136 : Deadline for Reply to Plaintiff United States of America's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Their Entitlement to Credits Under § 41 [DOC. 127]: September 26, 2017 (currently September 19, 2017); Deadline for Reply to Plaintiff United States of America's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Their Entitlement to Deductions Under § 179D [DOC. 128]: September 26, 2017 (currently September 19, 2017); Deadline to Reply to United States' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion toExclude the Testimony of Dr. Yvan J. Beliveau [DOC. 129]: September 26, 2017(currently September 19, 2017); Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff United States of Americas Motion to Exclude Testimony of R. Nicholson Worley [DOC. 130]: September 25, 2017 (NO CHANGE); Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding 179D Deduction [DOC. 133]: September 26, 2017 (currently September 19, 2017); Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Defendants Claim for Tax Credits Provided by 26 U.S.C. § 41 [DOC. 134]: September 26, 2017 (currently September 19, 2017); and Deadline for Reply to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff United States of America's Motion to Exclude Testimony of R. Nicholson Worley [DOC. 130] October 9, 2017 (NO CHANGE). Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/15/17. (ep)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
69
DECISION AND ENTRY - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: Defendants shall pay Plaintiffs reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the total amount of $8,563.68. re 68 Affidavit filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6/8/2017. (srb)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing
67
DECISION AND ENTRY - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants must pay Plaintiffs reasonable fees and expenses caused by their failure to comply with the Courts January 23, 2017 Order. Plaintiff is directed to file a declaration documenting its re asonable fees and expenses within 5 days of this Order. Defendants may, but are not required to, respond to Plaintiffs declaration within 5 days after it is filed; 2. Plaintiffs discovery deadline is extended to June 30, 2017; 3. The cut-off date fo r filing summary judgment motions isextended to July 31, 2017; 4. Plaintiff may, but is not required to, depose up to 5 additional witnesses; and 5. Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs Interrogatories 2 and 11 by May 31, 2017. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions under Rule 37(b) (Doc. # 61 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 5/16/15. (pb)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing
59
DECISION AND ENTRY - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production (Doc. # 32 ) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part, as described ;2. Defendants Motion to Compel Reponses to Interrogatories and Identification of Lay Witnesses (Doc. # 39 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as described ; 3. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories (Doc. # 42 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as described above; 4. Defendan ts Motion to Quash the Depositions of Kenneth Lowery and Lance Beck and Motion for Protection (Doc. # 47 ) is DENIED as moot; and 5. Plaintiffs Motion to Quash the Depositions of IRS Employees or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order (Doc. # 49 ) is GRANTED, in part, as to the Deposition of Wayde Smith, and DENIED, in part, as to the Deposition of Rebecca McGraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/23/17. (pb)
|
October 16, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-16-2015. (de)
|