Beau Townsend Ford Lincoln Inc v. Don Hinds Ford Inc

Plaintiff: Beau Townsend Ford Lincoln Inc
Defendant: Don Hinds Ford Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv00400
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDERSTAYING EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL granting 67 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 11/8/17. (pb)
October 30, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER EXTENDING THE AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION PROVISION OF RULE 62 UNTIL AND THROUGH NOVEMBER 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-30-2017. (de)
October 16, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Beau Townsend Ford Lincoln Inc against Don Hinds Ford Inc. Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/16/17. (ep)
October 6, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT AND POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST 58 AND ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED JUDGMENT ENTRY BY OCTOBER 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-6-2017. (de)
September 25, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF BEAU TOWNSEND FORD LINCOLN INC., 45 , AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING INPART DEFENDANT DON HINDS FORD, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 38 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-25-2017. (de)
July 12, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/12/16. (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beau Townsend Ford Lincoln Inc v. Don Hinds Ford Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Townsend Ford Lincoln Inc
Represented By: James M Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hinds Ford Inc
Represented By: Ray Allen Cox
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Halbert
Represented By: Brian Scott Jones
Represented By: Ronald Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?