Durham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sylvia Durham
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2015cv00416
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. # 16 ) is ADOPTED in full; 2. The Unopposed Motion for Attorney's Fee Award (Doc. # 14 ) be GRANTED; 3. Fees, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406{b), in the amount of $16,537.50 be AWARDED; and 4. This case remain terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/7/19. (kma)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT: (1) THE UNOPPOSED MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR AN ATTORNEYS FEE AWARD (DOC. 14 ) BE GRANTED; (2) FEES, PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,537.50 BE AWARDED; AND (3) THIS CASE REMAIN TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET. Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/25/19. (kma)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman (Doc. # 11 ), to whom this case was referred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b ), and noting that no objections have been filed thereto and that the time for filing such objections under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b) has expired, hereby ADOPTS said Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. #[1 1]) is ADOPTED in full; 2. The Commissioner's non-disability determination is REVERSED; 3. This matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner under the Fourth Sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further proceedings; and 4. This case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/27/17. (kma)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT: (1) THE ALJS NON-DISABILITY FINDING BE FOUND UNSUPPORTED BY SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENCE, AND REVERSED; (2) THIS MATTER BE REMANDED TO THE COMMISSIONER UNDER THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) FOR PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS OPINION; AND (3) THIS CASE BE CLOSED re 1 Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/10/17. (kma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Durham
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?