United States of America v. Dorf et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Martin J Dorf, Alice K Dorf and Diversity Products Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv00044
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE - The Clerk of Court is directed to note in the record that: 1. Referral of this case to the undersigned Judicial Officer has expired; and 2. No motions or other matters in this case remain pending before the undersigned Judicial Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 4/25/2017. (srb) Modified on 4/26/2017 (jmb).
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING IN THEIR ENTIRETY REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. # 28 ); PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DOC. # 23 ) IS SUSTAINED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT SHAL L ENTER IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS ALICE K. DORF, DIVERSITY PRODUCTS, INC., D/B/A SLOT MACHINES AND NATIONAL CITY BANK, NOW KNOWN AS PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(2), default judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff and against Dorf, Diversity and PNC as follows: 1. Against Dorf in the amount of $135,890.86, plus interest and otheradditional amounts that have accrued after February 9, 2016, and will continue to accrue as provided by law, with respect to unpaid federal income taxes (Form 1040) for tax years ending December 31, 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, and 2013; 2. Against Diversity, in the amount of $983, 153.90, plus interest and other additional amounts that have accrued after February 9, 2016, and will continue to accrue as provided by law, with respect to unpaid federal corporate income taxes (Form 1120) for tax years ending December 31, 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2005, and 2006; 3. Against Diversity, through the Court 9;s declaration that Plaintiff holds valid and subsisting liens associated with said Diversity's tax debts that attach to all property and rights to property belonging to Diversity; and 4. Against Dorf and PNC, in that they have no right, title, claim, lien, or interest in the below-described property. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 12/2/2016. (srb)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff United States Of Americas Motion For Entry of Default Judgment (Doc. # 23 ) be GRANTED; and 2. The Court enter Default Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2): a. a gainst Defendant Alice K. Dorf in the amount of $135,890.86, plus interest and other additional amounts that have accrued after February 9, 2016, and will continue to accrue as provided by law, with respect to unpaid federal income taxes (Form 1 040) for tax years ending December 31, 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, and 2013; b. against Defendant Diversity Products, Inc. d/b/a Slot Machines, in the amount of $983,153.90, plus interest and other additional amounts that have accrued after F ebruary 9, 2016, and will continue to accrue as provided by law, with respect to unpaid federal corporate income taxes (Form 1120) for tax years ending December 31, 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2005, and 2006; c. against Defendant Diversity Products, Inc . d/b/a Slot Machines, declaring that the Plaintiff United States of America holds valid and subsisting liens associated with its tax debts that attach to all property and rights to property belonging to said Defendant, ; and d. finding that Defenda nts Alice K. Dorf and National City Bank, now known as PNC Bank, National Association, have no right, title, claim, lien, or interest in the Property. Objections to R&R due by 11/10/2016. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10/21/2016. (srb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dorf et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Philip Leonard Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J Dorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice K Dorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversity Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?