Nason v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Susan Lynn Nason
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv00049
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) APPROVING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (DOC. 28 ) FOR AN AWARD UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (EAJA); AND (2) AWARDING EAJA ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 2,531.25 granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/7/18. (pb)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The report and recommendations 14 is ADOPTED in full and, the Commissioner's motion to dismiss 12 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6-21-2017. (de)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DOC. 12 ) BE DENIED - Accordingly, the undersigned finds equitable tolling appropriate in this case and RECOMMENDS that the Commissioners motion to dismiss (doc. 12 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/5/2017. (srb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nason v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lynn Nason
Represented By: Lenee M Brosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?