Collins v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Percy Collins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv00074
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECISION AND ENTRY - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. The Parties' Joint Stipulation and Assignment for an Award of Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (Doc. # 15 ) is accepted, and the Commissioner shall direct that an award o f Plaintiff's attorne fees, costs, and expenses in the total amount of $3,600.00 be made payable to Plaintiff's counsel; 2. Counsel for the parties shall verify, within thirty days of this Decision and Entry, whether or not Plaintiff owes a pre-existing debt to the United States subject to offset. If no such pre-existing debt exists. Defendant shall pay the EAJA award directly to Plaintiffs counsel pursuant to the EAJA assignment signed by Plaintiff [and counsel]; and 3. The case remains terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/9/2017. (srb)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING IN THEIR ENTIRETY REPORTAND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATEJUDGE (DOC. # 12 ); JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT NANCY A. BERRYHILL, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY A DMINISTRATION, REVERSING THE DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER'S DECISION THAT PLAINTIFF WAS NOT DISABLED AND, THEREFORE, NOT ENTITLED TO BENEFITS UNDER THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT, AND REMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE TO THE DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER, PURSUANT TO THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS;TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/14/17. (pb)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 1) The Commissioner's non-disability finding be vacated; 2) No finding be made as to whether Plaintiff Percy Collins, Jr. was under a "disability" within the meaning of the Social Security Act; 3) This case be remanded to the Social Security Administration for further consideration; and 4) The case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/24/17. (mcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Collins
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?