Jarrell v. McDonald et., al.

Plaintiff: Stephen Paul Jarrell
Defendant: Robert McDonald, US Attorney General and US Attorney
Case Number: 3:2016cv00095
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT DAVID SHULKIN, SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (DOC. # 41 ), AND OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC.# 39 ); ALL OF PLAINTIFF STEPHEN PA UL JARRELL'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE DEFENDANT SECRETARY ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE TO REFILING IN THIS COURT; JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER IN FAVOR OF THE SECRETARY AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/20/18. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11/28/17. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 35 Plaintiff's Motion for a Medical Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10-17-17. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (1) 10 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS be DENIED, in part, as to Plaintiff's Claim #1; and GRANTED in remaining part; and (2) Defendants United States Attorney and United States Attorney General be dismissed as parties to this case. Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1-18-17. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrell v. McDonald et., al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Paul Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?