Terebinski v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Terebinski and Carol S Terebinski
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00170
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE -The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within 30 days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement between the parties, if necessary. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12-27-2016. (de)
October 11, 2016 Minute Entry: This civil case came before the Court for a discovery status conference on Thursday, September 29, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. Attorneys Andrew Meier and Mark Gams participated. Discovery is progressing. The parties expressed an interest in private mediation. The Court suggested the parties also consider mediating the case before Judge Ovington. If the parties decide to settle the case outside the Court or with Judge Ovington, they shall promptly notify the Court by calling Diane Marcus at 937-512-1641. (dm)
September 30, 2016 Filing 12 Witness List by Plaintiff Carol S Terebinski. (Smith, John)
September 30, 2016 Filing 11 Witness List by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Gams, Mark)
September 19, 2016 Notice of Correction re: 10 Notice (Other). Notices of depositions, Requests for Documents To Be Produced, and Proofs of Service shall not be filed until they are used in the proceedings or the court orders filing. FRCP 5(d). (jmb)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman: Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2016. Motions directed to pleadings due by 9/23/2016. Lay Witness due by 10/1/2016. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 12/1/2016. Defendant Primary Expert due by 12/1/2016. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 2/1/2017. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 2/1/2017. Discovery due by 3/15/2017. Status Conference (following completion of discovery)set for 3/29/2017 at 2:30 PM by telephone before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Motions not directed to pleadings due by 4/15/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2017 at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Exhibit Submission for Trial due by 11/1/2017. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/30/2016. (ep)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: This civil case was referred to the undersigned for all pretrial matters until expiration of the discovery period. The undersigned sets this case for a discovery status conference by telephone on 9/29/2016 at 10:30 am and on 1/12/2017 at 10:30 am. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/30/2016. (dm)
August 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/25/2016. Scheduling Order to issue. (ep)
August 11, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference has been reset for 8/25/2016 at 2:00 PM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) before Judge Thomas M. Rose. (ep)
August 5, 2016 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Plaintiff Carol S Terebinski. (Smith, John)
July 29, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Carol S Terebinski Supplemental Disclosures Under Rule 26(e)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Smith, John)
July 21, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference has been reset for 8/25/2016 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Per request of Counsel. (ep)
July 15, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, August 23, 2016 at 10:00 by telephone conference call before Judge Thomas M. Rose. The Court will initiate the call. Prior to the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY DISCLOSURE RULES of Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) and the MANDATORY, pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). NOTE: the format for the Rule 26(f) conference between counsel and the report to the Court has been altered. This new form is available on line and MUST be utilized in this case. THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In all cases with class action allegations, the parties shall include in their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report proposed deadlines for completing discovery relevant to those allegations and for filing a motion to certify a class, and a proposed date for class action determination. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. Should more attorneys be actively involved than those listed on the Courts docket, please notify the courtroom deputy, Liz Penski, at 937-512-1603, immediately, to include the additional attorneys in the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Only phone numbers for direct lines (not answering systems) should be provided to the Court. If you wish a direct line number other than your office number called, please advise the Court at least 24 hours preceding the conference. (ep)
June 27, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Carol S Terebinski of Service of Disclosures Under Federal Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Smith, John)
May 13, 2016 Notice of Correction re: #5 Affidavit...FOR FUTURE FILING PURPOSES, COUNSEL IS ADVISED THAT THIS DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED BY USING THE EVENT "NOTICE OF APPEARANCE" AND NOT THE EVENT "AFFIDAVIT"...DOCUMENT REMAINS ON THE DOCKET, AND COUNSEL IS ADDED TO THE CASE (pb)
May 12, 2016 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF FILING NOTICE OF MARK H. GAMS by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Gams, Mark)
May 5, 2016 Filing 4 (Copy of) ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (jmb)
May 5, 2016 Filing 3 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Carol S Terebinski. (Originally filed in the Miami County Common Pleas Court on March 31, 2016). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jmb)
May 5, 2016 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (jmb)
May 4, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Gams, Mark)
May 4, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miami County Common Pleas Court, case number 16 CV 00127 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5485088), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint+Summons, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Gams, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terebinski v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terebinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol S Terebinski
Represented By: John David Smith
Represented By: Andrew P Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark H. Gams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?