Cruz et al v. PNC Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Cruz, Rafael F. Cruz, Gloria Cruz and Rafael M. Cruz
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association and The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00292
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Filing 24 MANDATE of USCA as to #21 Notice of Appeal: No costs taxed. (er)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of USCA as to #21 Notice of Appeal: The Sixth Circuit AFFIRMS the judgment of the District Court. Note: Mandate to issue. (er)
February 1, 2017 Filing 22 USCA Case Number 17-3091 for #21 Notice of Appeal filed by Gloria Cruz, Rafael M. Cruz, Rafael F. Cruz. (pb)
January 27, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #19 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number 0648-5816597) by Plaintiffs Gloria Cruz, Rafael M. Cruz, Rafael F. Cruz. (Henderson, Toby)
January 10, 2017 Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 1/10/2017. (ep)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTRY AND ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1-10-2017. (de)
December 9, 2016 Notice of Correction re: #18 Response to Motion. The docket entry was corrected to reflect the correct docket event and reference the correct document numbers. (kma)
December 8, 2016 Filing 18 REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion re #16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants PNC Bank and the PNC Financial Services Group's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.. (Warren, Thomas) Modified on 12/9/2016 to show the correct docket event and reference correct document numbers.(kma).
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Replies due by 12/8/2016.. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 11-4-2016. (de)
November 3, 2016 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 12/8/2016. Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Reply by Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Reply) (Warren, Thomas)
October 25, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Gloria Cruz, Rafael M. Cruz, Rafael F. Cruz. (Henderson, Toby)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File - Plaintiffs have until October 25, 2016 to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint #14 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-23-2016. (de)
September 23, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 10/25/2016 (de)
September 22, 2016 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 10/25/2016. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Gloria Cruz, Rafael M. Cruz, Rafael F. Cruz. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Bruce, Matthew)
September 6, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Warren, Thomas)
August 22, 2016 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.. (Warren, Thomas)
August 22, 2016 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Warren, Thomas)
August 2, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: PNC Bank, National Association answer due 9/6/2016; The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc. answer due 9/6/2016. (jmb)
August 2, 2016 Filing 11 STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Move or Plead by Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.. (Warren, Thomas)
August 2, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Marie Hilsheimer for Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
August 2, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie Morgan Gabriel for Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc. (Gabriel, Jessie)
August 2, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Warren for Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc. (Warren, Thomas)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gary A. Gotto. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/29/2016. (srb)
July 28, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gary A. Gotto (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5594606) by Plaintiffs Gloria Cruz, Rafael M. Cruz, Rafael F. Cruz. Responses due by 8/22/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Henderson, Toby)
July 19, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.. The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc. served on 7/14/2016, answer due 8/4/2016. (Henderson, Toby)
July 19, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. PNC Bank, National Association served on 7/14/2016, answer due 8/4/2016. (Henderson, Toby)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 3:16-cv-09, 3:16-cr-45, 3:16-cr-02, 3:16-cr-01, 1:15-cv-699, 3:14-cv-381, 3:15-cv-143, 3:15-cr-148 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas M. Rose for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice and Thomas M. Rose on 7/12/2016. (jmb)
July 11, 2016 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PNC Bank, National Association, The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc. (jmb)
July 11, 2016 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. (jmb)
July 8, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5568260), filed by Rafael M. Cruz, Rafael F. Cruz, Gloria Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Civil Cover Sheet, #23 Summons Form) (Henderson, Toby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. PNC Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael F. Cruz
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Toby K Henderson
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Cruz
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Toby K Henderson
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael M. Cruz
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Toby K Henderson
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Thomas David Warren
Represented By: Jessie Morgan Gabriel
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The PNC Financial Service Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas David Warren
Represented By: Jessie Morgan Gabriel
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?