Tajkowski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nicole Tajkowski
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv00299
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: WARREN
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Ovington
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - The Court grants the parties' Joint Stipulation for an Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and awards Plaintiff $3,300.00 (three thousand three hundred dollars) in attorney fees, costs, and expenses. The award of attorney fees, costs, and expenses will fully satisfy and settle any and all of Plaintiffs claims under 28 U.S.C. § 2412 that may be payable in this case. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/3/17. (pb)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 - It is therefore ORDERED that: 1. The Report and Recommendations filed on June 26, 2017(Doc. # 12 ) is ADOPTED in full; 2. The Commissioner's non-disability finding is VACATED; 3. No finding is made as to whether Plaintiff Nicole Tajkowski was under a "disability" within the meaning of the Social Security Act;4. This matter is REMANDED to the Social Security Administration under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further consideration consistent with the Report and Recommendations and this Decision; and 5. The case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 7/13/17. (kma)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Commissioner's non-disability finding be vacated; no finding be made as to whether Plaintiff Nicole Tajkowski was under a "disability" within the meaning of the Social Security Act; this matter be REMAN DED to the Social Security Administration for further consideration consistent with this Report and Recommendations, and any decision adopting this Report and Recommendations; and the case be terminated on the Court's docket. Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6/26/2017. (lek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tajkowski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Tajkowski
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?