Fletcher et al v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Fletcher, Timothy Philpot, Marcia Fink and Lucinda Smith
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00302
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: DARKE
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 28, 2017, JUDGMENT (DOC. # 59 }; SUSTAINING DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR RETURN OF COSTS PAID INTO ESCROW (DOC. # 74 }; JUDGMENT TO ENTER IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS; CASE TO REMAIN TERMINATED ON COURT'S DOCKET. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/19/18. (pb)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR A BILL OF COSTS IN AMOUNT REQUESTED; SAID FUNDS TO BE PLACED INTO ESCROW WITH THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT CLERK OF COURTS IN DAYTON, OHIO, PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE DEFENDANT'S APPE AL ON THE MERITS or THJS COURT'S DECISION RENDERED FEBRUARY 28, 2017 - Plaintiffs seek taxable costs in the amount of $11,458.88, consisting of the filing fee for the Complaint, the Summons service fee, court reporter fees and transcript costs (Doc. # 60 ). Said request for a Bill of Costs in the amount aforesaid is deemed by this Court to be well taken and same is granted. The amount of $11,458.88 is to be paid by the Defendant into escrow, with the Clerk of Courts of the Un ited States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, at Dayton serving as the escrow agent, pending resolution of the Defendant's appeal on the merits of this Court's Decision rendered February 28, 2017. Said amount must be paid into escrow no later than twenty-one days from date of this Court's entry herein. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/4/2017. (srb)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Barbara Fletcher, Lucinda Smith, Marcia Fink, Timothy Philpot against Honeywell International, Inc.. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/28/2017. (jdf)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING MOTION OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED (DOC. # 15 ); OVERRULING WITHOUT PREJUDICE RETIREES' MOTION FOR (1) SUMMARY JUDG MENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, (2) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PREVENTING HONEYWELL FROM ENDING HEALTHCARE AFTER 2016; OUTLINING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Conclusion For the reasons stated above, the Court concludes that the CBA at issue is ambiguous concerning the parties' intent to vest lifetime retiree healthcare benefits. Extrinsic evidence is necessary to resolve the ambiguities, but cannot be considered on a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Accordingly, the Court OVERRULES Defendant Honeywell's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, Doc.# 15 . Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/15/2016. (srb)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/20/16. (kma)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TOCOMPEL ARBITRATION OF COLLECTIVELY-BARGAINED RETIREEHEALTHCARE DISPUTE (DOC. # 14 ); DISMISSING COUNT III OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE- For the reasons set forth above, the Court OVERRULES Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Collectively-Bargained Retiree Healthcare Dispute, Doc. # 14 , and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Count III of Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/13/16. (kma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher et al v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Fletcher
Represented By: John G Adam
Represented By: Stuart M Israel
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Philpot
Represented By: John G Adam
Represented By: Stuart M Israel
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Fink
Represented By: John G Adam
Represented By: Stuart M Israel
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Smith
Represented By: John G Adam
Represented By: Stuart M Israel
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: K. Winn Allen
Represented By: Jennifer M. Bandy
Represented By: Donald E Burton
Represented By: Charles Joseph Faruki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?