Prado v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Glenda Jacqueline Prado
Defendant: Jeffrey Thomas, J Kessel, Donna Fallis, Jimmy Combs, Jason Tavner, Kirk Keller, Brian Huddleston and Other Unnamed Greene County, Ohio Sheriff's Deputies
Case Number: 3:2016cv00306
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/20/19. (kma)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF GLENDA JACQUELINE PRADO'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFDEFENDANTS JEFFREY THOMAS, SEAN JOSEPH KESSEL, DONNA FALLIS, JIMMY COMBS, JASON TAVENER, KIRK KELLER A ND BRANDON HUDDLESON (DOC. # 62 ), AND OVERRULING WITHOUTPREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS TWO, THREE AND TWELVE TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. # 63 ); PLAINTIFF MAY, WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF THIS ENT RY, MOVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE INSTANTER AN AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ANDAUTHENTICATED EXHIBITS THERETO, IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL AND LOCAL RULES; IF PLAINTIFF OBTAINS LEAVE AND FILES AN AMENDED ME MORANDUM AND AUTHENTICATEDEXHIBITS, THEN DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF WITHIN SEVEN DAYS THEREAFTER; IF PLAINTIFF DOES NOT AMEND HER MEMORANDUM OR AUTHENTICATE EXHIBITS, THEN DEFENDANTS MAY RENEW THEIR MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS; AMENDED PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER (DOC. # 50 ) VACATED IN PART;TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY 17, 2018, AT 4:30 P.M.. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/4/18. (kma)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Defendant Keller complied with this Courts Order (Doc. # 51 ) to produce under seal an unredacted copy of his cell phone record (Doc. # 52 ). Upon in camera review, the record reveals that Defendant Keller did not speak to any other Defenda nts or employees of Greene County Childrens Services other than his wife, Beth Keller. Defendant Keller, therefore, has sufficiently responded to question four of Plaintiffs Third Request for Production of Documents. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (Doc. # 47 ) further response to this request is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 3/7/18. (kma)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECISION AND ENTRY- Defendants counsel reported to Plaintiffs counsel, the only notes of the meeting are the meeting minutes. Those have been provided. (Doc. #47, PageID #401). But, it is not clear from Defendant Huddlesons response that the only not es taken at the Board of County Commissioners Board Meeting are the meeting notes. Accordingly, he must provide any additional notes taken at the Board Meeting or, if warranted, must certify that he has conducted a reasonable search and found no such notes exist. Plaintiff has the initial burden of showing that the information she seeks is relevant to either partys claims or defenses. Mayer, 2016 WL 1632415, at *2 (citations omitted). She has not done so. Further, because her request lacks any s ubject restrictions, it is overly broad. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion to compel a response to this interrogatory is denied. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 2/22/18. (kma)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL OF PLAINTIFF GLENDA JACQUELINE PRADO (DOC. # 39 ), AND OVERRULING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT HER MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. # 44 ); TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDERED FOR THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 2, 2017, AT 4:30 P.M.. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/19/17. (kma)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENTRY EXTENDING DISCOVERY AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILING DEADLINES: Given that the parties have indicated that there is one discovery issue not yet resolved,said issue being under consideration by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz, the discovery deadline in the captioned cause is extended from September 4 to October 4, 2017. The cut-off date for filing of motions for summary judgment is extended to October 19, 2017.. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/20/17. (kma)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Disqualify "Attorneys Dawn Frisk and Jeffrey Charles Turner from representing multiple defendants in the present case due to potential conflicts of interest" (ECF No. 26) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/27/2016. (kpf)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify "Attorneys Dawn Frisk [sic; counsels correct name is Dawn M. Frick] and Jeffrey Charles Turner from representing multiple defendants in the present case due to potential conflicts of interest" (ECF No. 17) is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal after Defendants have answered the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/4/2016. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prado v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Jacqueline Prado
Represented By: George Andrew Katchmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Fallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Tavner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unnamed Greene County, Ohio Sheriff's Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?