Summers v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Plaintiff: Christopher Summers
Defendant: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2016cv00387
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 4/13/2017. (srb)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 16 19 - The Petition 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, Summers is DENIED a certificate of appealability, the Court CERTIFIES to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis; and the Clerk is ordered to TERMINATE this case on the docket. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4-11-2017. (de)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 3/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 2/22/2017. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Summers
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Represented By: M Scott Criss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?