Lackey v. Warden, London Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Eddie M Lackey
Respondent: Warden, London Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2016cv00458
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. #] 32 ); OVERRULING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. # 30 ); JUDGMENT TO ENTER IN FAVOR OF RESPONDENT AND AGAINST PETITIONER; CASE TO REMAIN TERMINATED ON DOCKET. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/21/17. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 14 ) AND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 17 ); OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS THERETO (DOCS. ## 15 , 20 ); DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2254 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (DOC. # 1 ); DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY AND LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER/S; JUDGMENT TO ENTER IN FAVOR OF RESPONDENT AND AGAINST PETITIONER; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/26/17. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Having reconsidered the Report in light of the Objections, the Magistrate Judge again respectfully recommends the Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with thi s conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/31/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 5/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/12/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey v. Warden, London Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eddie M Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, London Correctional Institution
Represented By: M Scott Criss
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?