Guglielmo v. Montgomery County, Ohio and the Montgomery County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Guglielmo
Defendant: Montgomery County, Ohio and the Montgomery County Board of Commissioners, Phil Plummer, Matthew Snyder, Zachary Zink, Matthew Sears, David Cohn, Brandon Ort and Bradley Cooper
Case Number: 3:2017cv00006
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: TERMINATION ENTRY - The Court having been advised that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6/5/19. (ep)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 123 ): All claims against Officers Cooper and Cohn are DISMISSED; Sgt. Snyder and Officers Zink, Sears and Ort are DENIED summary judgment on the basis of qualified immunity due to the existence of genuine issues of material fact; except with respect to such a claim against Sgt. Snyder, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims of deliberate indifference to serious medical needs brought against the indivi dual defendants are DISMISSED; the claims against Sheriff Plummer, Sgt. Snyder, and Officers Zink, Sears, and Ort in their official capacities are DISMISSED; the claims against Sheriff Plummer in his individual capacity are DISMISSED; the claim against Montgomery County based exclusively on its alleged ratification of the use of force against Guglielmo is DISMISSED; and all other claims shall proceed to trial. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5/28/19. (ep)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ENTRY AND ORDER -If the parties plan to present live testimony by video from a remote location, then the Court will address the procedures and requirements for presenting such remote testimony at the Final Pretrial Conference that is scheduled for Ju ne 6, 2019. If the parties plan to present deposition testimony, including video, then the Court directs the parties' attention to General Order No. Day 12-01 at 3.2.2 (Depositions) regarding the Court's requirements to present testimony. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5-15-2019. (de)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING IN PART MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE MICHAEL BERG'S TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT (DOC. 139 ), DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DR. WALDMAN'S TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT (DOC. 140 ), AND DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DR. GABRIEL'S TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT (DOC. 141 ): The Court DENIES IN PART the Motions in Limine (Doc. 139) as to Michael Berg, the sole exception being that Berg shall not be permitted to use the term "deliberate indifference" at trial. The Motions in Limine (Docs. 140-41) as to Dr. Waldman and Dr. Gabriel are DENIED in their entirety.Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5/14/19. (ep)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 120 ) AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL (DOC. 133 ). Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/12/18. (ep)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Report and Recommendation filed on December 4, 2017 52 is ADOPTED in full; and NaphCare Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint 30 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12-20-2017. (de)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: NaphCare Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint 30 be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 12/4/2017. (lk)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - The Court hereby GRANTS, in part, Montgomery County Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. # 35 ) and ORDERS this matter to proceed as follows: Deposition cut off; March 15, 2018, Plaintiff Primary Expert Designations, April 13, 2018 ; Defendant Primary Expert Designations, April 13, 2018; Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert Designations, May 11, 2018; Defendant Rebuttal Expert Designations, May 11, 2018; Discovery cut off, May 28, 2018, Cut-off date for filing summary judgment motions, Ju ne 14, 2018; The remainder of the schedule is unaffected. In the event of further discovery disputes, the parties shall contact United States Magistrate Judge Ovingtons Chambers to request an informal discovery conference pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R . 37.1. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan on or before November 30, 2017; 2. Montgomery County Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. # 35 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part; 3. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike (Doc. # 39 ) is DENIED; and 4. Montgomery County Defendants Motion for Protective Order (Doc. # 46 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11/17/17. (kma)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER PROHIBITING PUBLIC DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL SECURITY INFORMATION RELATED TO THE OPERATIONS OF THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY JAIL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11/13/17. (kma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guglielmo v. Montgomery County, Ohio and the Montgomery County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Guglielmo
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Ohio and the Montgomery County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Zink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Ort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?