Howard v. Warden, London Correctional Institution
Petitioner: |
Everette E. Howard |
Respondent: |
Warden, London Correctional Institution |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00015 |
Filed: |
January 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Dayton Office |
County: |
MADISON |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael R. Merz |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas M. Rose |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
44
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE MERZ, 35 39 , OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS TOMAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 36 41 , AND DENYING PETITIONER'S MO TIONS FOR A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. 33 34 THE CASE REMAINS TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1-26-2018. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 15, 2017 |
Filing
39
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (ECF No. 34) should be denied as untimely if it is construed as he requests or denied as without merit as recommended in the Report (ECF No. 35). I n either event because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability on the Courts ruling on the referenced Motion and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/14/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing
38
RECOMMITTAL ORDER - The District Judge has preliminarily considered the Objections and believes they will be more appropriately resolved after further analysis by the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(3), this matter i s hereby returned to the Magistrate Judge with instructions to file a supplemental report analyzing the Objections and making recommendations based on that analysis. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12-14-2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing
35
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Court deny Howards instant Motion (ECF Nos. 33 & 34), construed as a motion for relief from judgment. Objections to R&R due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/1/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
October 4, 2017 |
Filing
29
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE MERZ (DOC. 21 ), OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, (DOC. 18 , 24 ), DENYING PETITION FOR W RIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, (DOC. 1 ), AND TERMINATING THE INSTANT CASE : Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner is hereby denied a certificate of appealability and the Court certifies to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore Petitioner will not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/3/17. (ep)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 21, 2017 |
Filing
21
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Having reconsidered the case in light of Mr. Howards Objections, the Magistrate Judge again respectfully recommends that the Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagr ee with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 6/20/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
13
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Magistrate Judge respectfully recommends the Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 6/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 6/1/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?