Nelson v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Frederick Nelson, Jr.
Respondent: Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2017cv00062
Filed: February 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEFICIENCY ORDER - This case is before the Court on Petitioners filing of a Notice of Appeal (ECF No. 21 ) which was not accompanied by the appellate filing fee of $505.00. Pursuant to McGore v. Wrigglesworth, 114 F. 3d 601 (1997), it is hereb y ORDERED that Petitioner pay the filing fee of $505.00 not later than October 31, 2017, to the Clerk of this Court, OR file by that date with the Sixth Circuit a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Failure to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting documents with the Sixth Circuit (1) may result in dismissal of the appeal for failure to prosecute and (2) will result in this Courts assessing the entire filing fee against Petitioner. If the appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute, it will not be reinstated despite subsequent payment or filing of the in forma pauperis application. The Clerk shall certify a copy of this Order to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 10/12/2017. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 9/12/17. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS 15 , 18 , ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 14 AND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 , GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 10 , DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 1 , AND TERMINATING CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-11-2017. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Because Nelson has not proven he is entitled to equitable tolling of the statute of limitations, his Petition is time-barred and should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE on the basis. Because reasonable jurists w ould not disagree with this conclusion, the Court should also deny any requested certificate of appealability and certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/4/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Because the Petition here is barred by the statute of limitations, it should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE on that basis without reaching the other defenses. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclus ion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 7/20/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Nelson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?