Van Hook v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Michelle Van Hook
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2017cv00066
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) APPROVING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN AWARD UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (EAJA) (DOC. 15 ); AND (2) AWARDING PLAINTIFF $3,650.00 IN EAJA FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/5/17. (kma)
September 11, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 9/11/2017. (srb)
September 8, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING THE JOINT MOTION FOR REMAND 12 ; (2) REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER UNDER THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g) FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; AND (3) TERMINATING THIS CASE ON THE COURT'S DOCKET. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-8-2017. (de)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hook v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Van Hook
Represented By: Stephanie D Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?