Easterling v. TJK-ELS West End Inc
Plaintiff: Warren Easterling, r
Defendant: TJK-ELS West End Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv00067
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 10/3/17. (ep)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT: (1) PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BE DENIED (DOC. 2 );(2) DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 12 ) BE DENIED AS MOOT; (3) DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 14 ) BE GRANTED; (4) PLAINTI FFS COMPLAINT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND (5) THIS CASE BE TERMINATED. Objections to R&R due by 8/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/16/17.(kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The parties Rule 26(f) report shall be filed with the Court on or before May 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/20/2017. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easterling v. TJK-ELS West End Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Easterling, r
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJK-ELS West End Inc
Represented By: Kevin Charles Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?