Samworth, on behalf of natural minor child v. Cochlear Americas Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cheri Samworth, on behalf of natural minor child
Defendant: Cochlear Americas Corporation and Cochlear Limited
Case Number: 3:2017cv00076
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; TERMINATION ENTRY- The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the par ties may, upon good cause shown within 60 days, reopen the action ifsettlement is not consummated. Parties intending to preserve this Court's jurisdiction to enforce the settlement should be aware of Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of America , 114 S.Ct. 1673 (1994), and incorporate appropriate language in any substituted judgment entry. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the te1ms of the settlement between the parties, if necessary. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/29/17. (kma)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay - The parties are ordered to submit a status report to the Court no later than August 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 5/23/2017. (pb)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Service within 90 days of filing: This action was filed February 27, 2017 as of the date of this Order, Plaintiff has filed neither a waiver of service nor proof of service on Defendant, Cochlear Limited. Plaintiff is reminded that Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) requires the Court to dismiss an action in which service is not made withfo 90 days of filing the Complaint. Plaintiffs time for filing proof of service or waiver expires May 28, 2017. Unless proof of service is filed by that date, the Court will dismiss the Defendant from this action for Jack of service of process. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/7/2017. (srb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samworth, on behalf of natural minor child v. Cochlear Americas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochlear Americas Corporation
Represented By: Clifford S Mendelsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochlear Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Samworth, on behalf of natural minor child
Represented By: John T. Edwards
Represented By: Penny Unkraut Hendy
Represented By: Ronald Edward Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?