Oliver v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: William S. Oliver
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2017cv00104
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: (1) APPROVING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN AWARD UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT ("EAJA") (DOC. 24 ); (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION FOR EAJA FEES (DOC. 21) AS MOOT; AND (3) A WARDING PLAIN TIFF $2,818.75 IN EAJA FEES AND COSTS - This Social Security disability benefits appeal is before the Court on the parties' joint stipulation in which they agree that Plaintiff should be awarded attorney's fees and costs under the E qual Access to Justice Act ("EAJA"), 28 U.S.C. § 2412, in the amount of $2,818.75. Doc. 24 . Based upon the parties' stipulation in which they present no dispute that all requirements are met for the reasonable award of BA JA fees, the Court: (1) APPROVES the parties' joint stipulation (doc. 24 ); (2) DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiffs previously filed motion for EAJA fees (doc. 21 ); and (3) GRANTS Plaintiff EAJA fees and costs in the amount of $2,818.75. As no further matters remain pending for review, this case remains TERMINATED upon the Court's docket. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/2/2018. (srb)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 10/3/17. (pb)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. # 11 ) is ADOPTED in full; and2. Prose Plaintiffs motion for a default judgment (Doc. # 10 ) is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 6/30/17. (pb)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DOC. 10) BE DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/12/2017. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?