Perry v. Krieger Beard Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Perry, Travis Fain, Brian Fox and Aunshawn Henderson
Defendant: Directv LLC, AT&T Corp., DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Krieger Beard Services LLC and Dustin Krieger
Case Number: 3:2017cv00161
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE by Defendant DIRECTSAT USA, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Baxter, Ashley)
September 27, 2019 Filing 123 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (kma)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER AND ENTRY ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #118 AND DIRECTING THAT THE CLERK ENTER A DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT KRIEGER BEARD SERVICES, LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9-27-2019. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 17, 2019 Set/Reset Dayton PPTO Deadlines: Motions not directed to pleadings due by 6/8/2020. re #121 (kma)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING THE PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE DISCOVERY AND OTHER CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (DOC. #120 ); AND (2) AMENDING THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER - This civil case is before the Court on Plaintiffs unopposed motion to extend the discovery and other case management deadlines. Doc. 120. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED. The undersigned hereby amends the Preliminary Pretrial Order (doc. #86 ) as follows: Discovery due by 4/6/2020. Status Conference set for 4/23/2020 10:00 AM by Teleconference before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Motions not directed to the pleadings: June 8, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2021 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/17/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 4/6/2020. by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Gibson, Bradley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 119 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Aunshawn Henderson. (Savytska, Olena)
September 5, 2019 Filing 118 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT AN ENTRY OF DEFAULT ISSUE AGAINST DEFENDANT KRIEGER BEARD SERVICES, LLC. Objections to R&R due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/5/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/5/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, and absent opposition, the motion to compel filed by Defendants DirectTV and DirectSat USA (doc. #105 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC is ORDERED to respond, through counsel, to all outstanding discovery requests on or before 8/6/2019. In addition, on or before that date, Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC is also ORDERED to file a notice, through counsel, certifying that it has served discovery responses. Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC is NOTIFIED that its failure to fully respond to discovery requests and to comply with the Order may result in a finding of contempt and/or the imposition of sanctions. As previously stated by the Court, as a business entity, Krieger Beard Services, LLC cannot proceed in this case pro se and must have counsel enter an appearance on its behalf to proceed in this litigation. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/24/2019. (mnr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 115 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Opt-In Plaintiffs David Fitch, Sean Fuller, Ambrosio Gallegos, David Gardner, Jonathan Lasecki, Shawn Mann, William Messer, and Jeramie Overton (Voluntary) by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT KRIEGER BEARD SERVICES, LLC TO: (1) SHOW CAUSE; AND (2) FILE A MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO THE PENDING MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. #105 )- Accordingly, the undersigned ORDERS Defendant Krieger Beard to SHOW CAUSE, in writing and through counsel within 7 days from the entry of this Order, as to why sanctions, including an entry of default, should not issue against it for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. In addition to showing cause as set forth above, Defendant Krieger Beard is also ORDERED to file, through counsel, a memorandum in opposition to the DirectTV Defendants motion within 7 days from the entry of this Order. Defendant Krieger Beard is NOTIFIED that its failure to file a memorandum in opposition may result in the Court granting the DirectTV Defendants motion as unopposed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/8/19. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW (DOC. 99 ); (2) GRANTING THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. #111 ) FOR DEFENDANT KRIEGER BEARD SERVICES, LLC TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT DIRECTV AND DIRECTSATS MOTION TO COMPEL; (3) DEFERRING A RULING ON DEFENDANT DIRECTV AND DIRECTSATS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. #105 ); AND (3) GRANTING THE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL TO PLAINTIFFS CARPENTER, FITCH, FULLER, GALLEGOS, GARDNER, HERNANDEZ, LASECKI, MANN, MESSER AND OVERTON TO PROVIDE VERIFIED DISCOVERY RESPONSES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 5/2/19. (kma)
April 22, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #105 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC New date requested 5/10/2019. filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Defendants DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSat USA, LLC's Response in Opposition to Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC's Motion to Extend Response to Defendants DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSat USA, LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents pending ruling on Motion to Withdraw) (Dougherty, Colin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #105 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC New date requested 5/10/2019. by Defendants Dustin Krieger, Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brenneman, Deborah)
March 28, 2019 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 MOTION to File Document Under Seal (MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL) filed by Defendants Dustin Krieger, Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPS Tracking Information) (Brenneman, Deborah)
March 20, 2019 Filing 109 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) of Claims of Opt-In Plaintiffs Gerardo Hernandez, Erich Kelley, Marek Kurnat, and Van Strickland by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 108 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) of Claims of Opt-In Plaintiffs Michael Gardner, Matthew Hodge, and Steven Melching by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 107 Consent MOTION to Compel Verified Discovery Responses from Opt-In Plaintiffs Michael Carpenter, David Fitch, Sean Fuller, Ambrosio Gallegos, David Gardner, Jorge Hernandez, Jonathan Lasecki, Shawn Mann, William Messer, and Jeramie Overton by Defendant DIRECTSAT USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Defendant DirectSat USA, LLC's Consent Motion to Compel Verified Discovery Responses from Opt-In Plaintiffs) (Dougherty, Colin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION to File Document Under Seal Counsel for Defendants Krieger Beard Services, LLC and Dustin Krieger's Motion to Withdraw filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Defendants DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSAT USA, LLC's Response in Opposition to Counsel for Defendants Krieger Beard Services, LLC and Dustin Krieger's Motion to Withdraw, #2 Exhibit 1) (Dougherty, Colin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSAT USA, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Defendants DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSAT USA, LLC's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5) (Dougherty, Colin)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTATION ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall confer with regard to any outstanding discovery requests and, should such efforts not resolve any disputes, Defendants DirectTV and Directsat may file motions to compel. With regard to the pending motion to withdraw as counsel, any opposition to such motion shall be filed within the time period set forth in the Local Rules of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/22/2019. (mnr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 103 Minute Entry: This civil case before the Court for and informal discovery dispute conference on 2/22/2019. Attorneys Brian Greivenkamp, Bradley Gibson, Camille Fundora, Harold Lichten, Olena Savytska, Deborah Breeneman, Lindsay Nichols, and Colin Dougherty participated. The Court was advised by counsel for Defendants DirectTV and Directsat USA of either outstanding or incomplete discovery responses from certain parties and that they intend to oppose the pending motion to withdraw filed by counsel for Krieger Beard Services and Dustin Krieger. The Court will issue an Order by separate entry. (mnr)
February 21, 2019 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Dustin Krieger, Krieger Beard Services LLC re #101 Order,,,,, (Brenneman, Deborah)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER - The Court ORDERS counsel for Kreiger Beard Services, LLC and Dustin Krieger promptly serve these Defendants, in compliance with the Federal Rules, with: (1) a copy of the motion to withdraw, and (2) a copy of this Order. Counsel shall also file with the Court a new certificate of service evidencing service of the foregoing in accordance with the Civil Rules and the Local Rules. Krieger Beard Services, LLC and Mr. Krieger may file a response to the motion to withdraw within 21 days after proper service. With regard to the requested withdrawal of counsel on behalf of Defendant Krieger Beard Services, LLC, the Court also notes that limited liability companies may not appear in this Court pro se and, thus, may only appear through a licensed attorney admitted to practice in this Court. Rowland v. Cal. Mens Colony, 506 U.S. 194, 201-02 (1993). Should the Court ultimately grant the motion to withdraw as counsel, the undersigned notes that Krieger Beard Services, LLC, as a business entity, cannot proceed pro se and its failure to have counsel appear on its behalf may result in significant and serious adverse consequences to it, including an entry of default and issuance of a default judgment. See Iron Workers Dist. Council of S. Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Tr. v. K-COR, LLC, No. 3:14-CV-368, 2015 WL 10742767, at *1 (S.D. Ohio Nov. 13, 2015).IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/21/2019. (srb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE: At the request of counsel, a discovery telephone conference is set for 2/22/2019 at 2:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (dm)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTATION ORDER: Finding compelling reasons, counsel's motion for leave to file a motion to withdraw as counsel under seal (doc. 97) is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/8/2019. (mnr)
February 8, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Under Seal by Defendants Dustin Krieger, Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Brenneman, Deborah) Modified on 2/11/2019 (pb).
December 13, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Aunshawn Henderson, Morgan Perry of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms) (Savytska, Olena)
December 7, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Aunshawn Henderson, Morgan Perry of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms) (Savytska, Olena)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. McNelis and granting #89 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ashley E. Baxter. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12/3/2018. (srb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Aunshawn Henderson, Morgan Perry of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms) (Savytska, Olena)
November 26, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Aunshawn Henderson, Morgan Perry of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms) (Savytska, Olena)
November 23, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Aunshawn Henderson, Morgan Perry of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms) (Savytska, Olena)
November 23, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Aunshawn Henderson, Morgan Perry of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms) (Savytska, Olena)
November 21, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Aunshawn Henderson of Filing Opt-in Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-in Consent Forms) (Savytska, Olena)
November 13, 2018 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $200 paid - receipt number: 300DAY021422) of Ashley E. Baxter by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission) (Dougherty, Colin) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add receipt number (srb).
November 13, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $200 paid - receipt number: 300DAY021421) of Joseph A. McNelis III by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission) (Dougherty, Colin) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add receipt number (srb).
August 27, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/4/2019 10:00 AM by Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (srb)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF HEARINGS: This civil case was referred to Judge Newman for all pretrial matters until expiration of the discovery period. Judge Newman sets this case for discovery status conferences by telephone on 10/23/2018 at 10:00 a.m. and 9/4/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (srb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address by Camille Fundora (Fundora, Camille)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman : Motions directed to pleadings due by 8/21/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2018. Lay Witness due by 5/6/2019. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 5/20/2019. Defendant Primary Expert due by 7/8/2019. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 8/5/2019. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 9/3/2019. Discovery due by 10/4/2019. Status Conference 9following discovery) set for 11/7/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Motions not directed to pleadings due by 12/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 1:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Exhibit Submission for Trial due by 7/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/20/18. (ep)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-15-2018. (de)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #84 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-15-2018. (de)
August 14, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Proposed Agreed Protective Order) (Gibson, Bradley)
August 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas M. Rose: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/14/2018. Scheduling Order to issue. (ep)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court GRANTS the Motion To Withdraw Robi J. Baishnab, Esq. from the above-reference case.Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-8-2018. (de)
August 8, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Plaintiff Aunshawn Henderson (jlk)
August 7, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff Aunshawn Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion To Withdraw As Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 80 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENTRY AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 42(a) - Accordingly, Case Nos. 3:17-cv-161 and 3:18-cv-6 are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes and further filings in both cases shall be made in Case No. 3:17-cv-161.. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/2/18. (pb)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND COURT-SUPERVISED NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS (DOC. #62 ). Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/2/18. (pb)
June 6, 2018 Filing 77 RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
June 5, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Greivenkamp for Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Morgan Perry (Greivenkamp, Brian)
May 16, 2018 Filing 75 Reply re #74 Response (non motion) to Plaintiffs' Opposition to their Objections and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Notice by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
May 3, 2018 Filing 74 Response re #70 Objection (non motion) by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
April 26, 2018 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #68 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4-19-2018. (de)
April 12, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants Dustin Krieger, Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dustin Krieger, #2 Exhibit B - Independent Contractor Agreement) (Brenneman, Deborah)
April 12, 2018 Filing 70 Objection re #62 MOTION to Certify Class and Proposed Class Notice by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
April 12, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of C. Dougherty (To Be Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of C. Dougherty (To Be Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of C. Dougherty, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of C. Dougherty, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of C. Dougherty, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of C. Dougherty, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of C. Dougherty, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of C. Dougherty, #10 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Steven Rumschlag, #11 Exhibit 3-Declaration of Purnell G. Jackson, #12 Exhibit 4-Declaration of Paula M. Phillips, #13 Exhibit 5-Declaration of Susan C. Koons) (Dougherty, Colin)
April 12, 2018 Filing 68 Consent MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of their Consent Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Motion to File Documents Under Seal) (Dougherty, Colin)
April 10, 2018 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
April 6, 2018 Filing 66 Defendants Krieger Beard Services, LLC and Dustin Krieger's ANSWER to #57 Amended Complaint filed by Dustin Krieger, Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Brenneman, Deborah)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 3:18-cv-06 ARE related. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice and Thomas M. Rose on 04/05/2018 pursuant to TMR chambers. (jmb)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4-3-2018. (de)
April 2, 2018 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Briefs in Connection with Defendants DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSat USA, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Briefs in Connection with Defendants, DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSat USA, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs) (Dougherty, Colin)
March 22, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Travis Fain, Brian Fox, Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Morgan Perry dated May 15, 2017, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Travis Fain, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Brian Fox, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Morgan Perry dated August 23, 2017, #5 Exhibit Proposed Class Notice) (Gibson, Bradley)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan D. Christman. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 3/2/2018. (srb)
March 1, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice $200 of Jonathan D. Christman by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jonathan D. Christman) (Dougherty, Colin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to #57 Amended Complaint filed by DIRECTSAT USA, LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to #57 Amended Complaint filed by Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
February 14, 2018 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dustin Krieger on 2/5/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Gibson, Bradley)
February 5, 2018 Filing 57 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiffs against All Defendants, filed by Morgan Perry, Brian Fox, Travis Fain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form of Brian Fox, #2 Exhibit Consent Form of Travis Fain) (Gibson, Bradley)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. #52 ) AND TERMINATING THE MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS (DOC. #6 ), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DOC. #22 ), MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS (DOC. #23 ), MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DOC. #27 ), MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (DOC. #44 ) AND MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (DOC. #47 ) AS MOOT: Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1/29/18. (ep)
January 25, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
January 12, 2018 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Brenneman, Deborah)
January 12, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
December 22, 2017 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint) (Gibson, Bradley)
November 14, 2017 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Krieger Beard Services LLC, Krieger Beard Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Krieger Beard Services LLC for Krieger Beard Services LLC.. (Nichols, Lindsay)
October 20, 2017 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Strike #41 Reply to Response to Motion, Untimely Evidence and Argument Submitted in Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional Class Certification or Alternatively for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Plaint Motion for Conditional Class Certification filed by Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Brenneman, Deborah)
October 20, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Strike #41 Reply to Response to Motion, Strike Untimely Evidence and Argument Submitted with Plaintiff's Reply Brief Concerning Conditional Certification, or Alternatively, for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Plaintiff filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
October 6, 2017 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Strike #41 Reply to Response to Motion, Untimely Evidence and Argument Submitted in Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional Class Certification or Alternatively for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Plaint, #44 MOTION to Strike #41 Reply to Response to Motion, Strike Untimely Evidence and Argument Submitted with Plaintiff's Reply Brief Concerning Conditional Certification, or Alternatively, for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Gibson, Bradley)
September 15, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to Strike #41 Reply to Response to Motion, Untimely Evidence and Argument Submitted in Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional Class Certification or Alternatively for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification by Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brenneman, Deborah)
September 15, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brenneman, Deborah)
September 15, 2017 Filing 45 Reply re #39 Response (non motion) to Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Class Notice and Consent Form by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
September 15, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION to Strike #41 Reply to Response to Motion, Strike Untimely Evidence and Argument Submitted with Plaintiff's Reply Brief Concerning Conditional Certification, or Alternatively, for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Untimely Evidence and Argument Submitted with Plaintiff's Reply Brief Concerning Conditional Certification, or Alternatively, For Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Sur-Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Dougherty, Colin)
September 15, 2017 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) (Exhibit "A" - ECF No. 6-1 filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
September 15, 2017 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
September 1, 2017 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) filed by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Morgan Perry, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Brian Fox, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Travis Fain) (Gibson, Bradley)
September 1, 2017 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) (Exhibit "A" - ECF No. 6-1 filed by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
September 1, 2017 Filing 39 Response re #26 Objection (non motion) by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Revised Notice) (Gibson, Bradley)
September 1, 2017 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
September 1, 2017 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Gibson, Bradley)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response AND granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Responses due by 9/1/2017 Replies due by 9/1/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/11/17. (ep)
August 11, 2017 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 9/1/2017. Of Plaintiff by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gibson, Bradley)
August 9, 2017 Filing 35 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 9/1/2017. of Plaintiff by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Gibson, Bradley)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. New date requested 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-3-2017. (de)
August 2, 2017 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 8/18/2017. of Plaintiff by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Gibson, Bradley)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #32 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/27/2017. (srb)
July 26, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION to Seal Document #27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #28 Response in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit A to 27 and Exhibit B to 28 by Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brenneman, Deborah)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7/24/17. (ep)
July 21, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) Expedited Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dustin Krieger, #2 Exhibit B - Morgan Perry Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Custom Charges) (Brenneman, Deborah)
July 21, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Morgan Perry Documents) (Brenneman, Deborah)
July 21, 2017 Filing 26 Objection re #6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) , Expedited Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
July 21, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) , Expedited Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice of Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Lauren Dudley, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Stephen Rumschlag, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Purnell Jackson, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Paula Phillips, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Susan Koons, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty, #7 Exhibit A - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL (Exhibit to Declaratoin of Colin D. Dougherty), #8 Exhibit B - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #9 Exhibit C (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #10 Exhibit D (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #11 Exhibit E (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #12 Exhibit F (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #13 Exhibit G (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #14 Exhibit H (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #15 Exhibit I (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty), #16 Exhibit J (Exhibit to Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty)) (Dougherty, Colin)
July 21, 2017 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of their Consent Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Motion to File Documents Under Seal) (Dougherty, Colin)
July 21, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) (Exhibit "A" - ECF No. 6-1 by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Strike the Declaration and Purported Consent Form of Morgan Perry, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Motion to Strike the Declaration and Purported Consent Form of Morgan Perry) (Dougherty, Colin)
July 21, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Dougherty, Colin)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER withdrawing #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney pursuant to the filing of a Notice to Withdraw #20 filed 7/18/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-19-2017. (de)
July 18, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Colin D Dougherty substituting for John J. Haggerty as to Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
July 18, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC re #9 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Colin D. Dougherty as Trial Attorney (Haggerty, John)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages -. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-17-2017. (de)
July 14, 2017 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Briefs by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on Briefs) (Haggerty, John)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall have until July 21, 2017 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification, Expedited Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-in Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-12-2017. (de)
July 11, 2017 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/21/2017. to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification, Expedited Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification, Expedited Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs) (Haggerty, John)
July 11, 2017 Filing 15 STIPULATION (Second) to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Haggerty, John)
July 7, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Marie Nichols for Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC (Nichols, Lindsay)
July 7, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah S Brenneman for Defendant Krieger Beard Services LLC (Brenneman, Deborah)
July 7, 2017 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Haggerty, John)
June 30, 2017 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Directv LLC. (Haggerty, John)
June 30, 2017 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DIRECTSAT USA, LLC. (Haggerty, John)
June 30, 2017 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Colin D. Dougherty as Trial Attorney by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Consent Motion to Substitute and Designate Colin D. Dougherty as Trial Attorney for Defendants DIRECTV, LLC and DirectSat USA, LLC, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Motion to Substitute and Designate Colin D. Dougherty as Trial Attorney) (Haggerty, John)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Colin Dougherty by John H. Haggerty. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6/29/17. (kma)
June 29, 2017 Filing 8 PHV Filing fee: RE #7 $ 200.00, receipt number 300DAY019221 (pb)
June 28, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Colin D. Dougherty by Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Colin D. Dougherty) (Haggerty, John)
June 21, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) by Plaintiff Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Gibson, Bradley)
June 19, 2017 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Krieger Beard Services LLC on 5/8/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. (Gibson, Bradley)
June 19, 2017 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to DIRECTSAT USA, LLC on 5/8/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. (Gibson, Bradley)
June 19, 2017 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Directv LLC on 5/8/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. (Gibson, Bradley)
June 19, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Haggerty for Defendants DIRECTSAT USA, LLC, Directv LLC (Haggerty, John)
May 9, 2017 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (jmb)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND of Plaintiff against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5950114), filed by Morgan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Signed Consent Form) (Gibson, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Krieger Beard Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Perry
Represented By: Austin LiPuma
Represented By: Kenneth J Ignozzi
Represented By: Bradley Lawrence Gibson
Represented By: Brian Greivenkamp
Represented By: Kenneth J. Ignozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Fain
Represented By: Bradley Lawrence Gibson
Represented By: Brian Greivenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fox
Represented By: Bradley Lawrence Gibson
Represented By: Brian Greivenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aunshawn Henderson
Represented By: Camille Fundora
Represented By: Olena Savytska
Represented By: Harold Lichten
Represented By: Robi J Baishnab
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Jessica R. Doogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directv LLC
Represented By: Colin D Dougherty
Represented By: Jonathan D Christman
Represented By: Joseph A McNelis
Represented By: John J Haggerty
Represented By: Ashley E Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTSAT USA, LLC
Represented By: Colin D Dougherty
Represented By: Jonathan D Christman
Represented By: Joseph A McNelis
Represented By: John J Haggerty
Represented By: Ashley E Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krieger Beard Services LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Nichols
Represented By: Deborah S Brenneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Krieger
Represented By: Deborah S Brenneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?