Pastian v. International Credit Systems, Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Megan Pastian |
Defendant: |
International Credit Systems, Inc and Everybody Fitness of Troy, LLC, dba Everybody Fitness, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00252 |
Filed: |
July 28, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Dayton Office |
County: |
MONTGOMERY |
Presiding Judge: |
Walter H. Rice |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1692 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 8, 2021 |
Filing
80
DECISION, ORDER AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - Plaintiffs Application for Damages and Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs (Doc. # 79 ) hereby is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff is awarded statutory damages in the amount of $1,000; emotional distress dama ges in the amount of $10,000; attorneys fees in the amount of $58,917.25; and costs in the amount of $1,393.61; for a total award in favor of Plaintiff Megan Pastian and against Defendant Internal Credit Systems, Inc. in the amount of $71,310.86. Accordingly, the Court hereby ENTERS JUDGMENT against Internal Credit Systems, Inc. in the total amount of $71, 310.86. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10/8/21. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 5, 2021 |
Filing
75
DECISION AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court sua sponte with regard to the April 2, 2021 Decision and Order that ordered Defendant Internal Credit Systems to have new counsel appear on its behalf by no later than May 2, 2021. (Doc. # 74 ). In light of said Defendants failure to comply with that order, IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of Courts is DIRECTED to enter Internal Credit Systems, Inc.s default pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and 2. Plaintiff Megan Pastian is DIRECTED t o apply to the Court pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b)(2)(B) for a determination of the amount of damages owing. The Clerk of Court further is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant Internal Credit Systems, Inc. at the following two addres ses: P.O Box 52088 Durham, NC 27717 c/o Dennis M. ONeil 2356 Worthing Woods Boulevard Powell, OH 43065. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 5/5/21. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 3, 2020 |
Filing
65
ORDER - 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 48 is granted, in part, on the merits of her second and fourth FDCPA claims; 2) Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 48 is denied in remaining part; and 3) Plaintiff's first FDCPA claim is dismissed sua sponte for lack of standing and jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11-3-20. (slo1)
|
March 30, 2020 |
Filing
61
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. # 48 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal; and 2. On or before April 20, 2020, the parties shall brief the issue of whether Plaintiff has Article III standing to litigate each of her FDCPA claims in light of Buchholz v. Meyer Njus Tanick, PA, 946 F.3d 855 (6th Cir. 2020) and other pertinent case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 3/30/2020. (srb)
|
February 23, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant EveryBody Fitness, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 2-23-18. (mcm)
|
October 26, 2017 |
Filing
17
DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT "EVERYBODY FITNESS OF TROY, LLC[,] d.b.a. EVERYBODY FITNESS, LLC" (DOC. # 12 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/26/2017. (srb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?