Bailey et al v. Verso Corporation
Plaintiff: Clifford Bailey, James Spencer and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Defendant: Verso Corporation
Case Number: 3:2017cv00332
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME (DOC. 61 ); (2) TERMINATING PLAINTIFFS MOTION (DOC. 60 ) ON THE COURTS DOCKET WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING; AND (3) SETTING THIS CASE FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 15, 202 0: The Court sets this case for a status conference by telephone on September 15, 2020 at 2:00 pm to discuss, inter alia, when Plaintiffs motion can be refiled for the Courts consideration. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/27/2020. (kma)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND ENTRY DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IN THIS COURT (DOC. 47 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/15/2019. (srb)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AND ENTRY DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 19 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/17/2018. (srb)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING DEFENDANTS RULE 56(d) MOTION; (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC. 29) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING; (3) SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; AND (4) VACATING THE JULY 5, 2018 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/3/2018. (dm)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/13/17. (kma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Verso Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Bailey
Represented By: John G. Adam
Represented By: David M. Cook
Represented By: Stuart M Israel
Represented By: Maneesh Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spencer
Represented By: John G. Adam
Represented By: David M. Cook
Represented By: Stuart M Israel
Represented By: Maneesh Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Represented By: John G. Adam
Represented By: David M. Cook
Represented By: Stuart M Israel
Represented By: Maneesh Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verso Corporation
Represented By: Steven Mark Loewengart
Represented By: Curtis G. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?