Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175 v. The Dayton Power & Light Company et al
Plaintiff: Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175
Defendant: AES Corporation, DPL, Inc., The Dayton Power & Light Company and AES Ohio Generation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00339
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of USCA as to #17 Notice of Appeal filed by Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175 dismissing the case upon consideration of the parties' stipulation to dismiss. Note: No Mandate to issue. (sct)
March 5, 2018 Filing 19 USCA Case Number 18-3204 for #17 Notice of Appeal filed by Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175. (pb)
March 2, 2018 Filing 18 Filing fee: $ 505.00, receipt number 300DAY020254 re #17 Notice of Appeal (kma)
March 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #16 Clerk's Judgment, #15 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #14 Order on Motion for TRO (FILING FEE DUE) by Plaintiff Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175. (Doll, John)
February 15, 2018 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (jmb)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENTRY AND ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and terminating case. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2-14-2018. (de)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY AND ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-17-2017. (de)
October 16, 2017 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Ohio Generation, LLC, DPL, Inc., The Dayton Power & Light Company. (Rogers, Gregory)
October 10, 2017 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AES Corporation. (Rogers, Gregory)
October 10, 2017 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DPL, Inc.. (Rogers, Gregory)
October 10, 2017 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Dayton Power & Light Company. (Rogers, Gregory)
October 10, 2017 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AES Ohio Generation, LLC. (Rogers, Gregory)
October 10, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan T Priestle for Defendants AES Corporation, AES Ohio Generation, LLC, DPL, Inc., The Dayton Power & Light Company (Priestle, Evan)
October 9, 2017 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175. (Doll, John)
October 9, 2017 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Pl. Response, #2 Exhibit A - Compact- Decl. to G. Adams, #3 Exhibit B. FERC to Decl. of G. Adams, #4 Exhibit C. AES Ohio to Decl. of G. Adams, #5 Exhibit D. DP&L to Decl. of G. Adams) (Doll, John)
October 6, 2017 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Ohio Generation, LLC, DPL, Inc., The Dayton Power & Light Company. (Rogers, Gregory)
October 6, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Ohio Generation, LLC, DPL, Inc., The Dayton Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Buchanan Declaration) (Rogers, Gregory)
October 4, 2017 Filing 3 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175. (Doll, John)
October 2, 2017 ...If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington... (srb)
October 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas M. Rose: Pretrial Conference held on 10/2/2017. Injunction/Motion Hearing to be set for Wednesday, November 15, 2017 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 2 before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Telephone Status Conference to be set upon further notice of the Court. (Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen) (ep)
October 2, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 9:30 AM before Judge Thomas M. Rose. (ep)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Compact, #2 Exhibit B - FERC, #3 Exhibit C - Issue Resolution Plan) (Doll, John)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with request for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6143814), filed by Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Verification, #2 Exhibit A - Compact, #3 Exhibit B - FERC, #4 Exhibit C - DP&L Proposals, #5 Exhibit D - AES Proposals, #6 Exhibit E - Issue Resolution Plan, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Form DP&L Summons, #9 Summons Form DPL Summons, #10 Summons Form AES Ohio Summons, #11 Summons Form AES Corp. Summons, #12 Supplement Attorney Certificate) (Doll, John)
September 29, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Conference set for 10/2/2017 at 9:30 AM in by telephone before Judge Thomas M. Rose. The Court will initiate the call. (ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175 v. The Dayton Power & Light Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utilities Workers Of America, Local 175
Represented By: John Robert Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Parker Rogers
Represented By: Evan T Priestle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPL, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Parker Rogers
Represented By: Evan T Priestle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dayton Power & Light Company
Represented By: Gregory Parker Rogers
Represented By: Evan T Priestle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Ohio Generation, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Parker Rogers
Represented By: Evan T Priestle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?