American Power, LLC v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: American Power, LLC
Defendant: Douglas O. Harris, Murray J. Crane, Michael T. Morley, Scott Larson, Kelly Dier, Henry Prochazka, Berkley Buchanan, Dektrix LLC, Dektrix Transportation Services LLC, Dektrix Intermodal LLC, Marmon Highway Technologies LLC and Fontaine Engineered Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00347
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H. Rice
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILE DEFENDANTS' TWO MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (CASE NO. 3:17-CV-347, DOC. NO. 86 ; AND CASE NO. 3:21-CV-21, DOC. NO. 6 ). Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 07/14/2021. (bjr)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER OF DISMISSALS OF CERTAIN PARTIES AND CLAIMS- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing without prejudice Defendant Scott Larson from all claims in Case No. 3:17-cv-00347. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing without prejudice Defendants Douglas O. Harris, Murray J. Crane, Mike Morley, Scott Larson, Dektrix Transportation Services LLC (Dektrix Trans), and Dektrix Intermodal LLC (Dektrix Intermodal), from Count IV (Breach of Contract) in Case No. 3:17-cv-00347. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/26/21. (pb)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AMERICAN POWER, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE Upon motion, and for good cause shown, Cases No. 3:l7-cv-00347 and 3:21-cv-00021 shall be consolidated into Case No. 3:l7-cv-00347. All future case filings are to be filed in Case No. 3:17-cv-00347. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/23/2021. (srb)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC # 43 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART OBJECTIONS OF THE FONTAINE DEFENDANTS (DOC. # 46 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVE RRULING IN PART OBJECTIONS OF DEKTRIX DEFENDANTS (DOC.# 48 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS OF MARMON AND FONTAINE DEFENDANTS (DOC. # 16 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEKTRIX DEFENDANT S (DOC. # 20 ); DISMISSAL OF COUNT I AS TO THE FONTAINE DEFENDANTS, COUNT II AS TO DEFENDANTS PROCHAZKA, BUCHANAN AND DIER, COUNT VI AS TO DEFENDANTS HARRIS, CRANE, MORLEY, LARSON, DEKTRIX TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, LLC AND DEKTRIX INTERMODAL, LLC, AND COUNT VIII AS TO DEFENDANT LARSON IS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF FILING AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 14 DAYS SUBJECT TO THE STRICTURES OF FED. R. CIV. P.11. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/19/21. (pb)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 43 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS THERETO (DOCS. ## 46 , 48 ); SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART MARMON AND FONTAINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. # 16 ) AND DEKTRIX DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. # 20 ); SUSTAINING NUNC PRO TUNG PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEKTRIX DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 52 ); FULL OPINION TO FOLLOW; THIS OPINION IS NOT A FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/27/18. (kma)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. # 42 ); OVERRULING MIKE MORLEY'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. # 21 ) AND SCOTT LARSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. # 22 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/18/18. (kma)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accordingly, the Dektrix Defendants and the Fontaine Defendants Motions to Dismiss Count VIII lacks merit. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. The Dektrix Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 20 ) be GRANTED in part and t hat Count II against Defendant Larson be dismissed, and Counts III, IV and Count VII be dismissed; and DENIED in remaining part; and 2. The Fontaine Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 16 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 8/2/18. (kma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Power, LLC v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Power, LLC
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas O. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray J. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Dier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Prochazka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dektrix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dektrix Transportation Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dektrix Intermodal LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marmon Highway Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fontaine Engineered Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?