Matthews v. Dayton Police Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Anthony Matthews |
Defendant: |
Dayton Police Department, City of Dayton, Randy Betsinger and Sandy's Towing Service |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv00026 |
Filed: |
January 24, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Dayton Office |
County: |
MONTGOMERY |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Newman |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas M. Rose |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 30, 2018 |
Filing
45
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL (DOC. 42) BE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/30/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 10/30/2018 (dm).
|
October 3, 2018 |
Filing
40
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE NEWMAN 35 THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL CLAIMS BEDISMISSED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B); THAT DEFENDANT SANDY'S TOWING AND RECOVERY&# 039;S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 17 BE DENIED AS MOOT;THAT THE COURT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS; AND THAT THIS CASE BE TERMINATED ON THE COURT'S DOCKET. THE COURT ADDIT IONALLY FINDS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS 37 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-3-2018. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 10/3/2018 (de).
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing
35
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT: (1) PRO SE PLAINTIFFS FEDERAL CLAIMS BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B); (2) DEFENDANT SANDYS TOWING AND RECOVERY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 17 ) BE DENIED AS MOOT; (3) T HE COURT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PRO SE PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS; AND (4) THIS CASE BE TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET. Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/15/2018. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing
34
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE NEWMAN 20 THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 18 BE DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-27-2018. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 16, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING, NUNC PRO TUNC, PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 10); (2) DEEMING THIS CASE PROPERLY BEFORE THE COURT ON PRO SE PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 14); (3) STAYING THE PARTIES RULE 26 (f) CONFERENCE AND THE ISSUANCE OF A SCHEDULING ORDER PENDING DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SANDYS TOWING SERVICES MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. 17); (4) DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC. 28); (5) PERMITTING THE FILING OF PLAINTIFFS S URREPLY AND DEFENDANTS SUR-SURREPLY (DOCS. 26, 28); AND (6) DENYING PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. 29) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/16/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
20
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. 18 ) BE DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 5/14/18. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?