Miller v. GE Healthcare Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sean Miller
Defendant: GE Healthcare Inc., GE Healthcare AS, General Electric Company, Guerbet LLC, Mallinckrodt Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, Enterprise Holdings, Inc. dba Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. and Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00113
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a), the parties stipulation, and in the interest of justice, the Court transfers this action to the Western District of Oklahoma for all further proceedings. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2/28/2019. (srb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b)(1) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 51 , VACATING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS 50 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, AND SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS 36 . Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1-7-2019. (de)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENTRY AND ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. After review of the Motion to Dismiss and the Defendants' respective supporting memoranda, and further noting that the Motion to Dismiss is unopposed, it is hereby GRAN TED. The claims against the GE Defendants are DISMISSED under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6). The claims against the Guerbet Defendants and Mallinckrodt Defendants are DISMISSED under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-19-2018. (de)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. GE Healthcare Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Miller
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Anne M. Valentine
Represented By: Todd Alan Walburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: J Philip Calabrese
Represented By: Justin James Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare AS
Represented By: J Philip Calabrese
Represented By: Justin James Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: J Philip Calabrese
Represented By: Justin James Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerbet LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Benedicto
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, Inc. dba Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Benedicto
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?