Innomark Communications, LLC v. Champion Logistics Group
Plaintiff: Innomark Communications, LLC
Defendant: Champion Logistics Group
Case Number: 3:2018cv00274
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim filed by Innomark Communications, LLC. (Carr, Richard)
September 12, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #9 Response (non motion): Counsel is directed to refile document under the correct event,'Answer to Counterclaim', located under Civil, Answers to Complaints. As counsel follows the event through they will be prompted to select #8 Defendant's Counterclaim as an option to respond to. Counsel should link the filing back to their original filing, document number #9 . (kma)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 Response re #8 Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim by Plaintiff Innomark Communications, LLC. (Carr, Richard)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM and Answer to Amended Complaint against Innomark Communications, LLC, filed by Champion Logistics Group. (Melick, Gregory)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Innomark Communications, LLC. (Carr, Richard)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Champion Logistics Group, filed by Innomark Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Carr, Richard)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Champion Logistics Group. (Melick, Gregory)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Champion Logistics Group. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. (Melick, Gregory)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Champion Logistics Group. Amendment to #2 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Melick, Gregory)
August 16, 2018 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (jmb)
August 16, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 3.1(a) Every complaint or other document initiating a civil action must accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet on a form available from the Clerk and on the Courts website at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/ohio-southern-district-forms. Notice of Removals require a Supplemental Cover Sheet. Initiating Counsel is instructed to file a civil cover sheet and Supplemental Cover Sheet. (jmb)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Champion Logistics Group, filed by Innomark Communications, LLC. (Orignally filed in the Common Pleas Court of Montgomery County, Ohio, Case No. 2018 CV 3624 on 08/08/2018). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jmb)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018 CV 03624 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6560807), filed by Champion Logistics Group. (Melick, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innomark Communications, LLC v. Champion Logistics Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Logistics Group
Represented By: Gregory H Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innomark Communications, LLC
Represented By: Richard Lines Carr, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Rickert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?