Landmark Technology, LLC v. A.M. Leonard, Inc.

Plaintiff: Landmark Technology, LLC
Defendant: A.M. Leonard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00306
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, December 6, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. by telephone conference call before Judge Thomas M. Rose. The Court will initiate the call. Prior to the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY DISCLOSURE RULES of Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) and the MANDATORY, pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). NOTE: the format for the Rule 26(f) conference between counsel and the report to the Court has been altered. This new form is available on line and MUST be utilized in this case. THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In all cases with class action allegations, the parties shall include in their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report proposed deadlines for completing discovery relevant to those allegations and for filing a motion to certify a class, and a proposed date for class action determination. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. Should more attorneys be actively involved than those listed on the Courts docket, please notify the courtroom deputy, Liz Penski, at 937-512-1603, immediately, to include the additional attorneys in the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Only phone numbers for direct lines (not answering systems) should be provided to the Court. If you wish a direct line number other than your office number called, please advise the Court at least 24 hours preceding the conference. (ep)
October 9, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Patrizio, Frank)
September 19, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant A.M. Leonard, Inc.. A.M. Leonard, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (kma)
September 14, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: certified service was performed by the clerk's office on September 14, 2018, document 1, the complaint with attachments 1-9, document 2, Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with attachment 1, and document 4, summons issued, were sent by certified mail to A.M. Leonard, Inc., 241 Fox Drive, Piqua, OH 45356, Article Number ( 7012 3460 0000 4135 0839). (kma)
September 12, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to A.M. Leonard, Inc.. (kma)
September 12, 2018 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John A. Lee, Jennifer L. Ishimoto. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/12/18. (kma)
September 11, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-6593747) of John A. Lee and Jennifer L. Ishimoto by Plaintiff Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing for Jennifer Ishimoto and John Lee) (Wernow, Howard)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against A.M. Leonard, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6593651), filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - the '319 patent, #3 Exhibit B - the '631 patent, #4 Exhibit C - board decision, #5 Exhibit D - Maitra Decision, #6 Exhibit E - September 1995 Amendment, #7 Exhibit F - Reexam Certificates, #8 Exhibit G - Sample infringement contentions, #9 Summons Form to be signed by Clerk) (Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology, LLC v. A.M. Leonard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M. Leonard, Inc.
Represented By: Frank John Patrizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Jennifer Ishimoto
Represented By: John A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?