Simkins v. Grandview Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Simkins
Defendant: Curt Sulte, Indiana Neuroscience Associates, Michael Stafford, John Doe-3, MD Robin A Wright, Enrique Medina, Michael D Pillion, DO Grant Huish, Shelby Richardson, Stephanie Horne, Laura Campbell, Paul Michael Levy, Sgt Brian Lewis, MD Archie D Enoch, Lindsey Nicole Elliott, Kettering Health Network, Shannon Ravine, Adan A Fuentes, Rebecca Lewis, Liz Conell, Neurosurgical Care Inc, Patience Lesuer, Matthew Carpenter, Nancy Henne, Jacinta K Walker, Scott Cameron West, Geoffrey K Hahm, Craig Wolfe, David Jenkins, Christopher McIntosh, Andrew Lane, Joseph Wiley, Nicole K VanHorne, Jamie Peters, Ganesh Ghooray, Amy J Alexander, Erin Marie Williams, Joseph Blake, Nicole Marie Farrow, Susan Bullard, Elizabeth D Coriell, Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC, Jason Drew Schofield, Kettering Network Radiologist, Inc, Michael D McPheron, John Doe-2, Grandview Hospital, Duane Achtermaun, Erich H Muckala, Lindsay Dye, John Doe -1, L Kathryn Campbell, Andrew Paul Brochu, Clint Ball, Sidarth Goyal, Loredel E Corneja, Chief Richard Biehl and City of Dayton
Case Number: 3:2018cv00309
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION for Default Judgment against Matthew Carpenter filed by Defendant City of Dayton. (Musto, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Default Judgment against Matthew Carpenter by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
November 9, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Default Judgment against Neurosurgical Care by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
November 8, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Strike #37 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants Patience Lesuer, Christopher McIntosh. (Lee, Brian)
November 6, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC, Patience Lesuer, Christopher McIntosh. (Lee, Brian)
November 5, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (pb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Richard Biehl, City of Dayton, Andrew Lane, Joseph Wiley, Craig Wolfe. (Musto, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 58 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ANSWER & MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES RE #37 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (pb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 57 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ANSWER & MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES RE #53 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (pb)
November 1, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Brian Lewis. (Jagielski, Anne)
October 31, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jmb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, the motion of Defendants Dr. McIntosh, Dr. Lesuer and Bobcat Emergency Physicians, LLC for leave to file an answer instanter (doc. #52 ) is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/31/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 30, 2018 Filing 53 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC, Patience Lesuer, Christopher McIntosh. (Lee, Brian)
October 30, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer, Instanter by Defendants Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC, Patience Lesuer, Christopher McIntosh. (Lee, Brian)
October 29, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Joseph Blake, Geoffrey K Hahm, Kettering Network Radiologist, Inc, Erich H Muckala, Jason Drew Schofield, Scott Cameron West. (Welch, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 50 RESPONSE to 12(b)(6) Motion re #35 filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 29, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion 12(b)(6) by Defendant Brian Lewis re #36 filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 29, 2018 Filing 48 Response to Answer & Request to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #27 by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 29, 2018 Filing 47 Response to Answer & Request to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #26 by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 29, 2018 Filing 46 Response to Answer & Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike re #34 by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTATION ORDER: In light of the numerous Rule 12 motions now pending before the Court, the undersigned finds good cause to stay issuance of a Rule 16 Scheduling Order in this case. Accordingly, the undersigned STAYS issuance of a Scheduling Order pending disposition of the pending Rule 12 motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/26/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 25, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Clarify filed by Defendants Duane Achtermaun, Amy J Alexander, Clint Ball, Andrew Paul Brochu, Susan Bullard, L Kathryn Campbell, Laura Campbell, Liz Conell, Elizabeth D Coriell, Loredel E Corneja, Lindsay Dye, Lindsey Nicole Elliott, Archie D Enoch, Nicole Marie Farrow, Sidarth Goyal, Grandview Hospital, Geoffrey K Hahm, Nancy Henne, Grant Huish, David Jenkins, Kettering Health Network, Rebecca Lewis, Michael D McPheron, Enrique Medina, Jamie Peters, Michael D Pillion, Shannon Ravine, Shelby Richardson, Jason Drew Schofield, Michael Stafford, Curt Sulte, Nicole K VanHorne, Jacinta K Walker, Erin Marie Williams. (Pepper, Timothy)
October 25, 2018 Filing 43 Rule 12(f) MOTION to Strike #23 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 24, 2018 Filing 42 Rule 12)e) MOTION to Clarify Joined wth Rule 12(f) Motion to Strick #30 by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (pb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 19, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Receive Service by Email Through the Electronic Case Filing System by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
October 18, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (kma)
October 17, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC, Ganesh Ghooray, Indiana Neuroscience Associates, Robin A Wright. Ganesh Ghooray served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018; Indiana Neuroscience Associates served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018; Robin A Wright served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (kma)
October 16, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand and Request for Injunction filed by Robin A Wright. (Haviland, John)
October 16, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Brian Lewis. (Jagielski, Anne)
October 15, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ganesh Ghooray, Indiana Neuroscience Associates. (Weil, Rick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Joseph Blake, Geoffrey K Hahm, Kettering Network Radiologist, Inc, Erich H Muckala, Jason Drew Schofield, Scott Cameron West. (Welch, John)
October 12, 2018 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Indiana Neuroscience Associates. (Weil, Rick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kettering Health Network. (Pepper, Timothy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Grandview Hospital. (Pepper, Timothy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Duane Achtermaun, Amy J Alexander, Clint Ball, Andrew Paul Brochu, Susan Bullard, L Kathryn Campbell, Laura Campbell, Liz Conell, Elizabeth D Coriell, Loredel E Corneja, Lindsay Dye, Lindsey Nicole Elliott, Archie D Enoch, Nicole Marie Farrow, Sidarth Goyal, Grandview Hospital, Geoffrey K Hahm, Nancy Henne, Grant Huish, David Jenkins, Kettering Health Network, Rebecca Lewis, Michael D McPheron, Enrique Medina, Jamie Peters, Michael D Pillion, Shannon Ravine, Shelby Richardson, Jason Drew Schofield, Michael Stafford, Curt Sulte, Nicole K VanHorne, Jacinta K Walker, Erin Marie Williams. (Pepper, Timothy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John Francis Haviland for Defendant Robin A Wright (Haviland, John)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' motion for leave to file a memorandum that exceeds 20 pages in length (doc. #25 ) is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/09/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 27 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Stephanie Horne. (Adkinson, Patrick)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Adan A Fuentes. (Adkinson, Patrick)
October 9, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Duane Achtermaun, Amy J Alexander, Clint Ball, Andrew Paul Brochu, Susan Bullard, L Kathryn Campbell, Laura Campbell, Liz Conell, Elizabeth D Coriell, Loredel E Corneja, Lindsay Dye, Lindsey Nicole Elliott, Archie D Enoch, Nicole Marie Farrow, Sidarth Goyal, Grandview Hospital, Geoffrey K Hahm, Nancy Henne, Grant Huish, David Jenkins, Kettering Health Network, Rebecca Lewis, Michael D McPheron, Enrique Medina, Jamie Peters, Michael D Pillion, Shannon Ravine, Shelby Richardson, Jason Drew Schofield, Michael Stafford, Curt Sulte, Nicole K VanHorne, Jacinta K Walker, Erin Marie Williams. (Pepper, Timothy)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE re 22 Notice of Appearance : CA contacted counsel who attempted to file a Notice of Appearance on behalf of other counsel Kelly Schroeder. The document was filed in error and refiled under attorney, Kelly Schroeder's name. Document 22 has been restricted. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Marie Schroeder for Defendant Paul Michael Levy (Schroeder, Kelly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand and Request for Injunction filed by Paul Michael Levy. (Miller, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Blasik Miller for Defendant Paul Michael Levy (Miller, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Defendants Duane Achtermaun, Amy J Alexander, Clint Ball, Andrew Paul Brochu, Susan Bullard, L Kathryn Campbell, Laura Campbell, Liz Conell, Elizabeth D Coriell, Loredel E Corneja, Lindsay Dye, Lindsey Nicole Elliott, Archie D Enoch, Nicole Marie Farrow, Sidarth Goyal, Grandview Hospital, Geoffrey K Hahm, Nancy Henne, Grant Huish, David Jenkins, Kettering Health Network, Rebecca Lewis, Michael D McPheron, Enrique Medina, Jamie Peters, Michael D Pillion, Shannon Ravine, Shelby Richardson, Jason Drew Schofield, Michael Stafford, Curt Sulte, Nicole K VanHorne, Jacinta K Walker, Erin Marie Williams REGARDING LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Pepper, Timothy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy G Pepper for Defendants Duane Achtermaun, Amy J Alexander, Clint Ball, Andrew Paul Brochu, Susan Bullard, L Kathryn Campbell, Laura Campbell, Liz Conell, Elizabeth D Coriell, Loredel E Corneja, Lindsay Dye, Lindsey Nicole Elliott, Archie D Enoch, Nicole Marie Farrow, Sidarth Goyal, Grandview Hospital, Geoffrey K Hahm, Nancy Henne, Grant Huish, David Jenkins, Kettering Health Network, Rebecca Lewis, Michael D McPheron, Enrique Medina, Jamie Peters, Michael D Pillion, Shannon Ravine, Shelby Richardson, Jason Drew Schofield, Michael Stafford, Curt Sulte, Nicole K VanHorne, Jacinta K Walker, Erin Marie Williams (Pepper, Timothy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Defendant City of Dayton re #13 Summons Returned Executed, (Musto, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Richard Biehl, City of Dayton, Andrew Lane, Joseph Wiley, Craig Wolfe. (Musto, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Ganesh Ghooray, Indiana Neuroscience Associates. (Weil, Rick)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick L Weil for Defendants Ganesh Ghooray, Indiana Neuroscience Associates (Weil, Rick)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Duane Achtermaun, Amy J Alexander, Clint Ball, Joseph Blake, Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC, Andrew Paul Brochu, Susan Bullard, L Kathryn Campbell, Laura Campbell, Liz Conell, Elizabeth D Coriell, Loredel E Corneja, Lindsay Dye, Lindsey Nicole Elliott, Nicole Marie Farrow, Adan A Fuentes, Sidarth Goyal, Grandview Hospital, Nancy Henne, Stephanie Horne, Grant Huish, David Jenkins, Patience Lesuer, Paul Michael Levy, Rebecca Lewis, Christopher McIntosh, Michael D McPheron, Enrique Medina, Neurosurgical Care Inc, Jamie Peters, Michael D Pillion, Shannon Ravine, Shelby Richardson, Jason Drew Schofield, Michael Stafford, Curt Sulte, Nicole K VanHorne, Jacinta K Walker, Scott Cameron West, Erin Marie Williams. Duane Achtermaun served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Amy J Alexander served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Clint Ball served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Joseph Blake served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Andrew Paul Brochu served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Susan Bullard served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; L Kathryn Campbell served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Laura Campbell served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Liz Conell served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Elizabeth D Coriell served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Loredel E Corneja served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Lindsay Dye served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Lindsey Nicole Elliott served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Nicole Marie Farrow served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Adan A Fuentes served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Sidarth Goyal served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Grandview Hospital served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Nancy Henne served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Stephanie Horne served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Grant Huish served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; David Jenkins served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Patience Lesuer served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Paul Michael Levy served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Rebecca Lewis served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Christopher McIntosh served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Michael D McPheron served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Enrique Medina served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Neurosurgical Care Inc served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Jamie Peters served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Michael D Pillion served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Shannon Ravine served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Shelby Richardson served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Jason Drew Schofield served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Michael Stafford served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Curt Sulte served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Nicole K VanHorne served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Jacinta K Walker served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Scott Cameron West served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Erin Marie Williams served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (kma)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Richard Biehl, Matthew Carpenter, Andrew Lane. Richard Biehl served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Matthew Carpenter served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018; Andrew Lane served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (kma)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Jagielski for Defendant Brian Lewis (Jagielski, Anne)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Collin B. Showe for Defendant Brian Lewis (Showe, Collin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants City of Dayton, Archie D Enoch, Geoffrey K Hahm, Kettering Health Network, Kettering Network Radiologist, Inc, Brian Lewis, Erich H Muckala, Joseph Wiley, Craig Wolfe. City of Dayton served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018; Archie D Enoch served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Geoffrey K Hahm served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Kettering Health Network served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Kettering Network Radiologist, Inc served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Brian Lewis served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018; Erich H Muckala served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Joseph Wiley served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Craig Wolfe served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (kma)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Mazer for Defendant Brian Lewis (Mazer, Benjamin)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pb)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Upon the receipt of the required forms necessary to effectuate service of process, the U.S. Marshal is ORDERED to serve Defendants. The Court NOTIFIES pro se Plaintiff of his duty to complete service of process on each Defendant within 90 days from the date of this Order, and that failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/18/18. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER: This pro se civil case is before the Court on Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend his complaint. Doc. #3 . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a), because Plaintiff's complaint has not yet been served, he may amended his complaint "once as a matter of course" without need for a Court order permitting him leave to do so. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/18/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTATION ORDER: This pro se civil case is before the Court on Plaintiff's motion to withdraw his previously granted application to proceed in forma pauperis. Doc. #4 Plaintiff has not tendered any filing fee with his motion and, as a result, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion without prejudice to refile with the appropriate filing fee. IT IS SO ORDERED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/18/2018. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw In Forma Pauperis Motion and Pay Filing Fee by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct Civil Action(s) #2 by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (kma)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Lee Simkins. (kma)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, pro se Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (doc. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk and United States Marshal are ORDERED to hold service pending further Order of the Court following an initial review required by 28 U.S.C. 1915. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 9/13/18. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Richard Lee Simkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 USM 285 Forms) (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simkins v. Grandview Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Sulte
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Neuroscience Associates
Represented By: Rick L Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stafford
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Robin A Wright
Represented By: John Francis Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Medina
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Pillion
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO Grant Huish
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Richardson
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Horne
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Adkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Campbell
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Michael Levy
Represented By: Kelly Marie Schroeder
Represented By: Susan Blasik Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Brian Lewis
Represented By: Anne Jagielski
Represented By: Benjamin A. Mazer
Represented By: Collin B. Showe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Archie D Enoch
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Nicole Elliott
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kettering Health Network
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Ravine
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan A Fuentes
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Adkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Lewis
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Conell
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neurosurgical Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patience Lesuer
Represented By: Brian Christopher Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Henne
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacinta K Walker
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Cameron West
Represented By: John B Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey K Hahm
Represented By: John B Welch
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wolfe
Represented By: John C Musto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jenkins
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher McIntosh
Represented By: Brian Christopher Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lane
Represented By: John C Musto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Wiley
Represented By: John C Musto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole K VanHorne
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Peters
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ganesh Ghooray
Represented By: Rick L Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy J Alexander
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Marie Williams
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Blake
Represented By: John B Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Marie Farrow
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Bullard
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth D Coriell
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobcat Emergency Physicians LLC
Represented By: Brian Christopher Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Drew Schofield
Represented By: John B Welch
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kettering Network Radiologist, Inc
Represented By: John B Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D McPheron
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandview Hospital
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Achtermaun
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich H Muckala
Represented By: John B Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Dye
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe -1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Kathryn Campbell
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Paul Brochu
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Ball
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidarth Goyal
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loredel E Corneja
Represented By: Timothy G Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Richard Biehl
Represented By: John C Musto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dayton
Represented By: John C Musto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Simkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?